Nevada Legislature Header Graphic Home -
NELIS -
Search -
View Scheduled Meetings -
Spacer
Battle Born Flag
SB176
Introduced on: Mar 10, 2005
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Beers , Rhoads , Hardy , Cegavske , Raggio , Amodei , Care , Heck , McGinness , Tiffany , Washington , Conklin , Sherer , Carpenter , Christensen , Gansert , Grady , Hardy , Marvel , Sibley
Eliminates premium tax on annuities. (BDR 57-1010)
DECLARED EXEMPT
Fiscal Notes View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Yes.
Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(No further action taken.)

Upcoming Hearings
    
Past Hearings
  Senate Commerce and Labor     Mar-16-2005 08:00 AM    Minutes      No Action.
  Senate Commerce and Labor     Apr-06-2005 08:00 AM    Minutes      Without recommendation and rerefer.
  Senate Taxation     Apr-14-2005 01:30 PM    Minutes      Rerefer.
    
 
Votes
 
Bill Text As Introduced                                    
Amendments

Bill History

Mar 10, 2005

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To printer.

Mar 11, 2005

  • From printer. To committee.

Mar 14, 2005

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 07, 2005

  • From committee: Without recommendation and rerefer to the Committee on Taxation.
  • Rereferred to Committee on Taxation. To committee.

Apr 15, 2005

  • From committee: Rerefer to Committee on Finance.
  • Rereferred to Committee on Finance. To committee.
  • Exemption effective.

Jun 07, 2005

  • (No further action taken.)

Horizontal Rule Bar
Session Info | NELIS | Interim Info | Law Library | General Info | Counsel Bureau | Research Library | Assembly | Senate | FAQs  
View Scheduled Meetings | Publications | Proposals | Career Opportunities | Gift Shop | Site Map | Contact Us  


© 2017 Nevada Legislative Counsel Bureau
Nevada LCB Logo