Nevada Legislature Header Graphic Home -
NELIS -
Search -
View Scheduled Meetings -
Spacer
Battle Born Flag
AB202
Introduced on: Mar 14, 2005
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Parks , Hardy , Parnell , Pierce , Horne , Anderson , Arberry Jr. , Atkinson , Buckley , Claborn , Conklin , Gerhardt , Giunchigliani , Grady , Hogan , Kirkpatrick , Koivisto , Leslie , Manendo , McClain , Munford , Oceguera , Perkins , Sherer , Smith , Carlton , Titus
Revises provisions governing safe and respectful learning environment in public schools. (BDR 34-561)
Fiscal Notes View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: May have Fiscal Impact.
Effect on State: Yes.
Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 217.

Upcoming Hearings
    
Past Hearings
  Assembly Education     Apr-11-2005 03:45 PM    Minutes      To Subcommittee.
  Assembly Education     Apr-12-2005 05:00 PM    Minutes      Pending.
  Assembly Education     Apr-13-2005 03:45 PM    Minutes      Amend, and do pass as amended.
  Assembly Education     Apr-22-2005 11:05 AM    Minutes      Discussion only.
  Senate Human Resources and Education     May-02-2005 01:30 PM    Minutes      No Action.
  Senate Human Resources and Education     May-20-2005 11:00 AM    Minutes      Do pass.
    
 
Votes
  Assembly Final Passage    Apr-26   Yea 42,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
  Senate Final Passage    May-26   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
 
Bill Text As Introduced     1st Reprint                         As Enrolled        
Amendments Amend. No.585

Bill History

Mar 14, 2005

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To printer.

Mar 15, 2005

  • From printer. To committee.

Mar 28, 2005

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 25, 2005

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 585.) To printer.

Apr 26, 2005

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 42, Nays: None.) To Senate.

Apr 27, 2005

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Human Resources and Education. To committee.

May 23, 2005

  • From committee: Do pass.

May 25, 2005

  • Read second time.

May 26, 2005

  • Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.

May 27, 2005

  • In Assembly. To enrollment.

May 30, 2005

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 01, 2005

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 217.
  • Sections 1, 2, 5 to 8, inclusive, 10 and 11 of this act become effective July 1, 2005. Section 3 of this act effective July 1, 2005, for the purpose of adopting policies and on July 1, 2006, for all other purposes. Sections 4 and 9 of this act effective July 1, 2006.

Horizontal Rule Bar
Session Info | NELIS | Interim Info | Law Library | General Info | Counsel Bureau | Research Library | Assembly | Senate | FAQs  
View Scheduled Meetings | Publications | Proposals | Career Opportunities | Gift Shop | Site Map | Contact Us  


© 2017 Nevada Legislative Counsel Bureau
Nevada LCB Logo