Nevada Legislature Header Graphic Home -
NELIS -
Search -
View Scheduled Meetings -
Spacer
Battle Born Flag
AB221
Introduced on: Mar 17, 2005
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Oceguera , Manendo , Leslie , Parks , Anderson , Angle , Buckley , Christensen , Claborn , Conklin , Denis , Gerhardt , Hogan , Horne , Munford , Pierce
Makes various changes relating to intoxicating liquors. (BDR 20270)
Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.
Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 352.

Upcoming Hearings
    
Past Hearings
  Assembly Judiciary     Mar-24-2005 08:00 AM    Minutes      Pending.
  Assembly Judiciary     Apr-07-2005 08:00 AM    Minutes      Amend, and do pass as amended.
  Senate Judiciary     May-05-2005 08:00 AM    Minutes      No Action.
  Senate Judiciary     May-17-2005 09:00 AM    Minutes      No Action.
  Senate Judiciary     May-20-2005 08:00 AM    Minutes      Amend, and do pass as amended.
    
 
Votes
  Assembly Final Passage    Apr-22   Yea 41,   Nay 0,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
  Senate Final Passage    May-27   Yea 17,   Nay 4,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
 
Bill Text As Introduced     1st Reprint         2nd Reprint     3rd Reprint     4th Reprint         As Enrolled        
Amendments Amend. No.269 Amend. No.578 Amend. No.888 Amend. No.CA5

Bill History

Mar 17, 2005

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.

Mar 18, 2005

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 14, 2005

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

Apr 15, 2005

  • Taken from Second Reading File.
  • Placed on Chief Clerk's desk.

Apr 18, 2005

  • Taken from Chief Clerk's desk.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 269.) To printer.

Apr 19, 2005

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint.
  • Taken from General File.
  • Placed on Chief Clerk's desk.

Apr 21, 2005

  • Taken from Chief Clerk's desk.
  • Placed on General File.
  • Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 578.) To printer.

Apr 22, 2005

  • From printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Second reprint.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 41, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Senate.

Apr 25, 2005

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.

May 23, 2005

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

May 25, 2005

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 888.) To printer.

May 26, 2005

  • From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Third reprint.
  • Taken from General File. Placed on Secretary's desk.

May 27, 2005

  • Taken from Secretary's desk. Placed on General File.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 17, Nays: 4.) To Assembly.

May 30, 2005

  • In Assembly.
  • Senate Amendment No. 888 not concurred in. To Senate.

May 31, 2005

  • In Senate.

Jun 01, 2005

  • Senate Amendment No. 888 not receded from. Conference requested. First Conference Committee appointed by Senate. To Assembly.

Jun 02, 2005

  • In Assembly.
  • First Conference Committee appointed by Assembly. To committee.

Jun 04, 2005

  • From committee: Concur in Senate Amendment No. 888 and further amend. First Conference report adopted by Assembly.
  • First Conference report adopted by Senate.
  • To printer.
  • From printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Fourth reprint.
  • To enrollment.

Jun 05, 2005

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 10, 2005

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 352.
  • Effective June 10, 2005.

Horizontal Rule Bar
Session Info | NELIS | Interim Info | Law Library | General Info | Counsel Bureau | Research Library | Assembly | Senate | FAQs  
View Scheduled Meetings | Publications | Proposals | Career Opportunities | Gift Shop | Site Map | Contact Us  


© 2017 Nevada Legislative Counsel Bureau
Nevada LCB Logo