Nevada Legislature Header Graphic Home -
NELIS -
Search -
View Scheduled Meetings -
Spacer
Battle Born Flag
SB203
Introduced on: Mar 21, 2005
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Mathews
Revises various provisions relating to industrial injuries and occupational diseases of certain police officers and firefighters. (BDR 53-1078)
DECLARED EXEMPT
Fiscal Notes View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: May have Fiscal Impact.
Effect on State: Yes.
Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 465.

Upcoming Hearings
    
Past Hearings
  Senate Finance     Apr-11-2005 08:00 AM    Minutes      No Action.
  Senate Finance     May-27-2005 08:00 AM    Minutes      Mentioned No Jurisdiction.
  Senate Finance     Jun-02-2005 08:00 AM    Minutes      Mentioned Not Agendized.
  Senate Finance     Jun-03-2005 08:00 AM    Minutes      Mentioned Not Agendized.
  Senate Finance     Jun-04-2005 08:00 AM    Minutes      Amend, and do pass as amended.
  Senate Finance     Jun-05-2005 08:00 AM    Minutes      Mentioned Not Agendized.
  Assembly Ways and Means     Jun-06-2005 08:00 AM    Minutes      Discussion only.
  Assembly Ways and Means     Jun-06-2005 11:00 AM    Minutes      Do pass.
    
 
Votes
  Senate Final Passage    Jun-05   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
  Assembly Final Passage    Jun-06   Yea 42,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
 
Bill Text As Introduced     1st Reprint                         As Enrolled        
Amendments Amend. No.1199

Bill History

Mar 21, 2005

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Finance. To printer.

Mar 22, 2005

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 04, 2005

  • Notice of exemption.

Jun 05, 2005

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 1199.) To printer.
  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint.
  • Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.
  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Ways and Means. To committee.

Jun 06, 2005

  • From committee: Do pass.
  • Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
  • Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 42, Nays: None.) To Senate.
  • In Senate. To enrollment.

Jun 13, 2005

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 17, 2005

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 465.
  • Effective October 1, 2005.

Horizontal Rule Bar
Session Info | NELIS | Interim Info | Law Library | General Info | Counsel Bureau | Research Library | Assembly | Senate | FAQs  
View Scheduled Meetings | Publications | Proposals | Career Opportunities | Gift Shop | Site Map | Contact Us  


© 2017 Nevada Legislative Counsel Bureau
Nevada LCB Logo