Nevada Legislature Header Graphic Home -
NELIS -
Search -
View Scheduled Meetings -
Spacer
Battle Born Flag
SJR5
Introduced on: Mar 21, 2005
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Beers , Cegavske , Hardy , Tiffany , Washington
Proposes to amend Nevada Constitution to impose certain limitations on amount that Legislature or governing body of governmental entity may appropriate and authorize for expenditure. (BDR C-943)
Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.
Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(No further action taken.)

Upcoming Hearings
    
Past Hearings
  Senate Finance     Apr-13-2005 07:30 AM    Minutes      No Action.
  Senate Finance     Apr-15-2005 07:30 AM    Minutes      No Action.
  Senate Finance     Apr-25-2005 08:00 AM    Minutes      No Action.
  Senate Finance     Apr-26-2005 08:00 AM    Minutes      Do pass, failed.
    
 
Votes
 
Bill Text As Introduced                                    
Amendments

Bill History

Mar 21, 2005

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Finance. To printer.

Mar 22, 2005

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 16, 2005

  • (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)

Apr 21, 2005

  • Waiver granted effective: April 21, 2005.

Jun 07, 2005

  • (No further action taken.)

Horizontal Rule Bar
Session Info | NELIS | Interim Info | Law Library | General Info | Counsel Bureau | Research Library | Assembly | Senate | FAQs  
View Scheduled Meetings | Publications | Proposals | Career Opportunities | Gift Shop | Site Map | Contact Us  


© 2017 Nevada Legislative Counsel Bureau
Nevada LCB Logo