Nevada Legislature Header Graphic Home -
NELIS -
Search -
View Scheduled Meetings -
Spacer
Battle Born Flag
SB224
Introduced on: Mar 21, 2005
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Townsend , Gansert
Makes various changes relating to elections. (BDR 24698)
Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.
Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 504.

Upcoming Hearings
    
Past Hearings
  Senate Legislative Operations and Elections     Apr-05-2005 02:00 PM    Minutes      No Action.
  Senate Legislative Operations and Elections     Apr-12-2005 02:00 PM    Minutes      Amend, and do pass as amended.
  Assembly Elections, Procedures, Ethics, and Constitutional Amendments     May-03-2005 03:45 PM    Minutes      Pending.
  Senate Legislative Operations and Elections     May-12-2005 02:00 PM    Minutes      After Passage Discussion.
  Senate Legislative Operations and Elections     May-19-2005 02:00 PM    Minutes      After Passage Discussion.
  Assembly Elections, Procedures, Ethics, and Constitutional Amendments     May-19-2005 03:45 PM    Minutes      Amend, and do pass as amended.
  Senate Legislative Operations and Elections     May-31-2005 02:00 PM    Minutes      Do not concur.
    
 
Votes
  Senate Final Passage    Apr-26   Yea 20,   Nay 0,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
  Assembly Final Passage    May-27   Yea 37,   Nay 4,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
 
Bill Text As Introduced     1st Reprint         2nd Reprint     3rd Reprint             As Enrolled        
Amendments Amend. No.592 Amend. No.1102 Amend. No.CA45

Bill History

Mar 21, 2005

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To printer.

Mar 22, 2005

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 25, 2005

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 592.) To printer.

Apr 26, 2005

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 20, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Assembly.

Apr 27, 2005

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Elections, Procedures, Ethics, and Constitutional Amendments. To committee.

May 27, 2005

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
  • Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 1034.)
  • Action of adoption of Amendment No. 1034 rescinded.
  • Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 1102.) To printer.
  • From printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Second reprint.
  • Placed on General File.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 37, Nays: 4, Excused: 1.) To Senate.

May 30, 2005

  • In Senate.

Jun 01, 2005

  • Assembly Amendment No. 1102 not concurred in. To Assembly.

Jun 02, 2005

  • In Assembly.
  • Assembly Amendment No. 1102 not receded from. Conference requested. First Conference Committee appointed by Assembly. To Senate.

Jun 03, 2005

  • In Senate.
  • First Conference Committee appointed by Senate. To committee.

Jun 06, 2005

  • From committee: Concur in Assembly Amendment No. 1102 and further amend.
  • First Conference report adopted by Senate.
  • First Conference report adopted by Assembly.
  • To printer.

Jun 15, 2005

  • From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Third reprint.

Jun 16, 2005

  • To enrollment.

Jun 17, 2005

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.
  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 504.
  • Effective October 1, 2005.

Horizontal Rule Bar
Session Info | NELIS | Interim Info | Law Library | General Info | Counsel Bureau | Research Library | Assembly | Senate | FAQs  
View Scheduled Meetings | Publications | Proposals | Career Opportunities | Gift Shop | Site Map | Contact Us  


© 2017 Nevada Legislative Counsel Bureau
Nevada LCB Logo