Nevada Legislature Header Graphic Home -
NELIS -
Search -
View Scheduled Meetings -
Spacer
Battle Born Flag
SB226
Introduced on: Mar 21, 2005
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Carlton
Makes various changes to provisions governing payment of certain workers’ compensation claims. (BDR 53-891)
Fiscal Notes View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: May have Fiscal Impact.
Effect on State: Yes.
Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 344.

Upcoming Hearings
    
Past Hearings
  Senate Commerce and Labor     Apr-05-2005 08:00 AM    Minutes      No Action.
  Senate Commerce and Labor     Apr-12-2005 09:30 AM    Minutes      Amend, and do pass as amended.
  Senate Commerce and Labor     Apr-22-2005 08:00 AM    Minutes      Mentioned Not Agendized.
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     May-04-2005 02:00 PM    Minutes      Pending.
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     May-06-2005 Upon Adjournment    Minutes      Amend, and do pass as amended.
  Senate Commerce and Labor     May-27-2005 08:00 AM    Minutes      Do not concur.
    
 
Votes
  Senate Final Passage    Apr-25   Yea 19,   Nay 0,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 1,   Absent 0
  Assembly Final Passage    May-25   Yea 42,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
 
Bill Text As Introduced     1st Reprint         2nd Reprint     3rd Reprint     4th Reprint         As Enrolled        
Amendments Amend. No.295 Amend. No.574 Amend. No.705

Bill History

Mar 21, 2005

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To printer.

Mar 22, 2005

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 20, 2005

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

Apr 21, 2005

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 295.) To printer.

Apr 22, 2005

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint.
  • Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 574.) To printer.

Apr 25, 2005

  • From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 19, Nays: None, Excused: 1, Not voting: 1.) To Assembly.

Apr 26, 2005

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To committee.

May 24, 2005

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 705.) To printer.

May 25, 2005

  • From printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Third reprint.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 42, Nays: None.) To Senate.

May 26, 2005

  • In Senate.

May 27, 2005

  • Assembly Amendment No. 705 not concurred in. To Assembly.

May 30, 2005

  • In Assembly.

May 31, 2005

  • Assembly Amendment No. 705 receded from. To Senate.

Jun 01, 2005

  • In Senate.
  • To printer.

Jun 02, 2005

  • From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Fourth reprint.
  • To enrollment.

Jun 04, 2005

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 10, 2005

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 344.
  • Effective July 1, 2005.

Horizontal Rule Bar
Session Info | NELIS | Interim Info | Law Library | General Info | Counsel Bureau | Research Library | Assembly | Senate | FAQs  
View Scheduled Meetings | Publications | Proposals | Career Opportunities | Gift Shop | Site Map | Contact Us  


© 2017 Nevada Legislative Counsel Bureau
Nevada LCB Logo