Nevada Legislature Header Graphic Home -
NELIS -
Search -
View Scheduled Meetings -
Spacer
Battle Born Flag
SJR8
Introduced on: Mar 21, 2005
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Cegavske
Proposes to amend Nevada Constitution to make various changes concerning initiatives and referenda. (BDR C-298)
Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.
Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.2, no further action allowed.)

Upcoming Hearings
    
Past Hearings
  Senate Legislative Operations and Elections     Mar-29-2005 02:00 PM    Minutes      Reschedule.
  Senate Legislative Operations and Elections     Apr-05-2005 02:00 PM    Minutes      No Action.
  Senate Legislative Operations and Elections     Apr-12-2005 02:00 PM    Minutes      Do pass.
    
 
Votes
  Senate Final Passage    Apr-15   Yea 10,   Nay 11,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
 
Bill Text As Introduced                                    
Amendments

Bill History

Mar 21, 2005

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To printer.

Mar 22, 2005

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 13, 2005

  • From committee: Do pass.

Apr 14, 2005

  • Read second time.

Apr 15, 2005

  • Read third time. Lost. (Yeas: 10, Nays: 11.)

Apr 27, 2005

  • (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.2, no further action allowed.)

Horizontal Rule Bar
Session Info | NELIS | Interim Info | Law Library | General Info | Counsel Bureau | Research Library | Assembly | Senate | FAQs  
View Scheduled Meetings | Publications | Proposals | Career Opportunities | Gift Shop | Site Map | Contact Us  


© 2017 Nevada Legislative Counsel Bureau
Nevada LCB Logo