Nevada Legislature Header Graphic Home -
NELIS -
Search -
View Scheduled Meetings -
Spacer
Battle Born Flag
SB233
Introduced on: Mar 21, 2005
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Schneider
Makes various changes relating to alcoholic beverages. (BDR 52-154)
Fiscal Notes View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: Increases or Newly Provides for Term of Imprisonment in County or City Jail or Detention Facility.
Effect on State: Yes.
Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 345.

Upcoming Hearings
    
Past Hearings
  Senate Taxation     Mar-29-2005 01:30 PM    Minutes      No Action.
  Senate Taxation     Apr-12-2005 01:30 PM    Minutes      Amend, and do pass as amended.
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     May-13-2005 Upon Adjournment    Minutes      Amend, and do pass as amended.
  Senate Taxation     May-31-2005 02:00 PM    Minutes      Concur.
    
 
Votes (2/3 Majority Required)
  Senate Final Passage    Apr-26   Yea 20,   Nay 0,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
  Assembly Final Passage    May-27   Yea 41,   Nay 0,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
 
Bill Text As Introduced     1st Reprint         2nd Reprint                 As Enrolled        
Amendments Amend. No.376 Amend. No.759

Bill History

Mar 21, 2005

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Taxation. To printer.

Mar 22, 2005

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 22, 2005

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

Apr 25, 2005

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 376.) To printer.

Apr 26, 2005

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 20, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Assembly.

Apr 27, 2005

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To committee.

May 26, 2005

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 759.) To printer.

May 27, 2005

  • From printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Second reprint.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 41, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Senate.

May 30, 2005

  • In Senate.

Jun 01, 2005

  • Assembly Amendment No. 759 concurred in. To enrollment.

Jun 03, 2005

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 10, 2005

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 345.
  • Effective June 10, 2005.

Horizontal Rule Bar
Session Info | NELIS | Interim Info | Law Library | General Info | Counsel Bureau | Research Library | Assembly | Senate | FAQs  
View Scheduled Meetings | Publications | Proposals | Career Opportunities | Gift Shop | Site Map | Contact Us  


© 2017 Nevada Legislative Counsel Bureau
Nevada LCB Logo