Nevada Legislature Header Graphic Home -
NELIS -
Search -
View Scheduled Meetings -
Spacer
Battle Born Flag
AJR7
Introduced on: Mar 21, 2005
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Giunchigliani
Proposes to amend Nevada Constitution to repeal limitations on terms of elected officers. (BDR C-235)
Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.
Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.2, no further action allowed.)

Upcoming Hearings
    
Past Hearings
  Assembly Elections, Procedures, Ethics, and Constitutional Amendments     Apr-07-2005 Upon Adjournment    Minutes      No Action.
  Assembly Elections, Procedures, Ethics, and Constitutional Amendments     Apr-14-2005 Upon Adjournment    Minutes      Amend, and do pass as amended.
    
 
Votes
 
Bill Text As Introduced     1st Reprint                                
Amendments Amend. No.431

Bill History

Mar 21, 2005

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Elections, Procedures, Ethics, and Constitutional Amendments. To printer.

Mar 22, 2005

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 19, 2005

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

Apr 20, 2005

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 431.) To printer.

Apr 21, 2005

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint.
  • Taken from General File.
  • Placed on Chief Clerk's desk.

Apr 27, 2005

  • (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.2, no further action allowed.)

Horizontal Rule Bar
Session Info | NELIS | Interim Info | Law Library | General Info | Counsel Bureau | Research Library | Assembly | Senate | FAQs  
View Scheduled Meetings | Publications | Proposals | Career Opportunities | Gift Shop | Site Map | Contact Us  


© 2017 Nevada Legislative Counsel Bureau
Nevada LCB Logo