Nevada Legislature Header Graphic Home -
NELIS -
Search -
View Scheduled Meetings -
Spacer
Battle Born Flag
SB240
Introduced on: Mar 21, 2005
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Washington
Enacts provisions relating to health benefit plans that have high deductibles and are in compliance with certain federal requirements for establishing health savings accounts. (BDR 57-47)
Fiscal Notes View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Yes.
Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.4, no further action allowed.)

Upcoming Hearings
    
Past Hearings
  Senate Commerce and Labor     Apr-08-2005 07:00 AM    Minutes      No Action.
  Senate Commerce and Labor     Apr-14-2005 08:00 AM    Minutes      Amend, and do pass as amended.
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     May-06-2005 Upon Adjournment    Minutes      Pending.
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     May-20-2005 01:00 PM    Minutes      Do pass.
  Senate Commerce and Labor     Jun-02-2005 03:30 PM    Minutes      After Passage Discussion.
    
 
Votes
  Senate Final Passage    Apr-21   Yea 17,   Nay 2,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 1,   Absent 0
 
Bill Text As Introduced     1st Reprint                                
Amendments Amend. No.370

Bill History

Mar 21, 2005

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To printer.

Mar 22, 2005

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 04, 2005

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 19, 2005

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

Apr 20, 2005

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 370.) To printer.

Apr 21, 2005

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 17, Nays: 2, Excused: 1, Not voting: 1.) To Assembly.

Apr 22, 2005

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To committee.

May 26, 2005

  • From committee: Do pass.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time.

May 28, 2005

  • (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.4, no further action allowed.)

Horizontal Rule Bar
Session Info | NELIS | Interim Info | Law Library | General Info | Counsel Bureau | Research Library | Assembly | Senate | FAQs  
View Scheduled Meetings | Publications | Proposals | Career Opportunities | Gift Shop | Site Map | Contact Us  


© 2017 Nevada Legislative Counsel Bureau
Nevada LCB Logo