Nevada Legislature Header Graphic Home -
NELIS -
Search -
View Scheduled Meetings -
Spacer
Battle Born Flag
AB299
Introduced on: Mar 21, 2005
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Marvel
Authorizes exchange of land with Reno-Sparks Indian Colony and construction of new restitution center for Department of Corrections. (BDR S-820)
DECLARED EXEMPT
Fiscal Notes View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Yes.
Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 358.

Upcoming Hearings
    
Past Hearings
  Assembly Government Affairs     Apr-13-2005 07:30 AM    Minutes      Pending.
  Assembly Government Affairs     Apr-15-2005 07:30 AM    Minutes      Amend, and do pass as amended.
  Assembly Ways and Means     May-02-2005 08:30 AM    Minutes      No Action.
  Assembly Ways and Means     May-11-2005 Upon Adjournment    Minutes      Amend, and do pass as amended.
  Senate Finance     May-24-2005 08:00 AM    Minutes      No Action.
  Senate Finance     May-27-2005 08:00 AM    Minutes      Do pass.
    
 
Votes
  Assembly Final Passage    May-18   Yea 42,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
  Senate Final Passage    May-27   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
 
Bill Text As Introduced     1st Reprint         2nd Reprint                 As Enrolled        
Amendments Amend. No.459 Amend. No.746

Bill History

Mar 21, 2005

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer.

Mar 22, 2005

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 08, 2005

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 20, 2005

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 459.) To printer.

Apr 21, 2005

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint.
  • Taken from General File.
  • Placed on Chief Clerk's desk.

Apr 22, 2005

  • Notice of exemption.
  • Taken from Chief Clerk's desk.
  • Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. To committee.

May 16, 2005

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

May 17, 2005

  • Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 746.) To printer.

May 18, 2005

  • From printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Second reprint.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 42, Nays: None.) To Senate.

May 19, 2005

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Finance. To committee.

May 27, 2005

  • From committee: Do pass.
  • Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
  • Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.

May 30, 2005

  • In Assembly. To enrollment.

Jun 01, 2005

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 10, 2005

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 358.
  • Effective July 1, 2005.

Horizontal Rule Bar
Session Info | NELIS | Interim Info | Law Library | General Info | Counsel Bureau | Research Library | Assembly | Senate | FAQs  
View Scheduled Meetings | Publications | Proposals | Career Opportunities | Gift Shop | Site Map | Contact Us  


© 2017 Nevada Legislative Counsel Bureau
Nevada LCB Logo