Nevada Legislature Header Graphic Home -
NELIS -
Search -
View Scheduled Meetings -
Spacer
Battle Born Flag
SB247
Introduced on: Mar 21, 2005
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Titus
Revises provisions governing tax on live entertainment. (BDR 32-680)
DECLARED EXEMPT
Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.
Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(No further action taken.)

Upcoming Hearings
    
Past Hearings
  Senate Taxation     Apr-12-2005 01:30 PM    Minutes      No Action.
  Senate Taxation     Apr-14-2005 01:30 PM    Minutes      Amend, and do pass as amended.
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     May-16-2005 02:00 PM    Minutes      Rerefer.
  Assembly Ways and Means     May-26-2005 08:00 AM    Minutes      No Action.
  Senate Taxation     Jun-05-2005 02:00 PM    Minutes      After Passage Discussion.
    
 
Votes
  Senate Final Passage    Apr-25   Yea 20,   Nay 0,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
 
Bill Text As Introduced     1st Reprint                                
Amendments Amend. No.438

Bill History

Mar 21, 2005

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Taxation. To printer.

Mar 22, 2005

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 11, 2005

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 21, 2005

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

Apr 22, 2005

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 438.) To printer.

Apr 25, 2005

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 20, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Assembly.

Apr 26, 2005

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To committee.

May 17, 2005

  • From committee: Re-refer to Committee on Ways and Means.
  • Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. To committee.
  • Exemption effective.

Jun 07, 2005

  • (No further action taken.)

Horizontal Rule Bar
Session Info | NELIS | Interim Info | Law Library | General Info | Counsel Bureau | Research Library | Assembly | Senate | FAQs  
View Scheduled Meetings | Publications | Proposals | Career Opportunities | Gift Shop | Site Map | Contact Us  


© 2017 Nevada Legislative Counsel Bureau
Nevada LCB Logo