Nevada Legislature Header Graphic Home -
NELIS -
Search -
View Scheduled Meetings -
Spacer
Battle Born Flag
AB307
Introduced on: Mar 21, 2005
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
McClain , Koivisto , Carpenter , Smith , Giunchigliani , Arberry Jr. , Atkinson , Buckley , Claborn , Conklin , Denis , Gerhardt , Leslie , Manendo , McCleary , Munford , Oceguera , Parks , Parnell , Pierce
Makes various changes concerning registration of motor vehicles and operations of Department of Motor Vehicles. (BDR 43-346)
DECLARED EXEMPT
Fiscal Notes View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: May have Fiscal Impact.
Effect on State: Yes.
Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 447.

Upcoming Hearings
    
Past Hearings
  Assembly Transportation     Mar-29-2005 01:30 PM    Minutes      Pending.
  Assembly Ways and Means     Apr-05-2005 08:00 AM    Minutes      Discussion only.
  Assembly Transportation     Apr-07-2005 01:30 PM    Minutes      Amend, and do pass, as amended, and rerefer.
  Assembly Ways and Means     May-02-2005 Upon Adjournment    Minutes      No Action.
  Assembly Ways and Means     Jun-05-2005 08:00 AM    Minutes      Amend, and do pass as amended.
  Senate Transportation and Homeland Security     Jun-06-2005 08:30 PM    Minutes      Amend, and do pass as amended.
    
 
Votes
  Assembly Final Passage    Jun-06   Yea 42,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
  Senate Final Passage    Jun-07   Yea 19,   Nay 1,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
 
Bill Text As Introduced     1st Reprint         2nd Reprint     3rd Reprint             As Enrolled        
Amendments Amend. No.214 Amend. No.1217 Amend. No.1245

Bill History

Mar 21, 2005

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Transportation. To printer.

Mar 22, 2005

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 04, 2005

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 12, 2005

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended, and rerefer to Committee on Ways and Means.

Apr 14, 2005

  • Notice of exemption.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 214.) Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. To printer.

Apr 15, 2005

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint.
  • To committee.

Jun 06, 2005

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on General File.
  • Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 1217.) To printer.
  • From printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Second reprint.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 42, Nays: None.) To Senate.
  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Transportation and Homeland Security. To committee.
  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 1245.) To printer.
  • From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Third reprint.
  • Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution.

Jun 07, 2005

  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 19, Nays: 1, Excused: 1.) To Assembly.
  • In Assembly.
  • Senate Amendment No. 1245 concurred in. To enrollment.

Jun 15, 2005

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.
  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 447.
  • Effective July 1, 2005.

Horizontal Rule Bar
Session Info | NELIS | Interim Info | Law Library | General Info | Counsel Bureau | Research Library | Assembly | Senate | FAQs  
View Scheduled Meetings | Publications | Proposals | Career Opportunities | Gift Shop | Site Map | Contact Us  


© 2017 Nevada Legislative Counsel Bureau
Nevada LCB Logo