Nevada Legislature Header Graphic Home -
NELIS -
Search -
View Scheduled Meetings -
Spacer
Battle Born Flag
AB312
Introduced on: Mar 21, 2005
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Sibley , Hardy , Mabey , Conklin , Parks , Allen , Atkinson , Buckley , Carpenter , Christensen , Denis , Gansert , Gerhardt , Giunchigliani , Goicoechea , Grady , Hettrick , Horne , Kirkpatrick , Manendo , McCleary , Munford , Oceguera , Perkins , Seale , Sherer , Weber , Titus , Coffin , Townsend , Beers , Carlton , Amodei , Cegavske , Hardy , Heck , Lee , Wiener
Requires certain governmental entities to conduct certain sales and other disposals of certain public lands and real property by public auction or upon sealed bids followed by oral offers. (BDR 261089)
Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.
Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 381.

Upcoming Hearings
    
Past Hearings
  Assembly Growth and Infrastructure     Apr-05-2005 01:30 PM    Minutes      Pending.
  Assembly Growth and Infrastructure     Apr-14-2005 01:30 PM    Minutes      Amend, and do pass as amended.
  Senate Government Affairs     May-16-2005 02:00 PM    Minutes      No Action.
  Senate Government Affairs     May-18-2005 02:00 PM    Minutes      No Action.
  Senate Government Affairs     May-20-2005 11:00 AM    Minutes      Amend, and do pass as amended.
    
 
Votes
  Assembly Final Passage    Apr-26   Yea 39,   Nay 2,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 1,   Absent 0
  Senate Final Passage    May-27   Yea 20,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 1,   Absent 0
 
Bill Text As Introduced     1st Reprint         2nd Reprint                 As Enrolled        
Amendments Amend. No.647 Amend. No.1049

Bill History

Mar 21, 2005

  • Read first time.
  • Referred to Committee on Government Affairs.
  • Action of referral rescinded.
  • Referred to Committee on Growth and Infrastructure. To printer.

Mar 22, 2005

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 26, 2005

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 647.) To printer.
  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint.
  • Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 39, Nays: 2, Not voting: 1.) To Senate.

Apr 27, 2005

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To committee.

May 26, 2005

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

May 27, 2005

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 1049.) To printer.
  • From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint.
  • Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 20, Nays: None, Not voting: 1.) To Assembly.

May 30, 2005

  • In Assembly.

May 31, 2005

  • Senate Amendment No. 1049 concurred in. To enrollment.

Jun 02, 2005

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 13, 2005

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 381.
  • Effective July 1, 2005.

Horizontal Rule Bar
Session Info | NELIS | Interim Info | Law Library | General Info | Counsel Bureau | Research Library | Assembly | Senate | FAQs  
View Scheduled Meetings | Publications | Proposals | Career Opportunities | Gift Shop | Site Map | Contact Us  


© 2017 Nevada Legislative Counsel Bureau
Nevada LCB Logo