Nevada Legislature Header Graphic Home -
NELIS -
Search -
View Scheduled Meetings -
Spacer
Battle Born Flag
AB313
Introduced on: Mar 21, 2005
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Anderson , Giunchigliani , Buckley , Oceguera , Conklin , Perkins
Makes various changes relating to expenditures required by disasters or financial emergencies. (BDR 31-1145)
DECLARED EXEMPT
Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.
Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(No further action taken.)

Upcoming Hearings
    
Past Hearings
  Assembly Ways and Means     Mar-28-2005 09:00 AM    Minutes      No Action.
  Assembly Ways and Means     May-11-2005 Upon Adjournment    Minutes      Amend, and do pass as amended.
  Senate Finance     May-26-2005 08:00 AM    Minutes      No Action.
    
 
Votes
  Assembly Final Passage    May-23   Yea 42,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
 
Bill Text As Introduced     1st Reprint                                
Amendments Amend. No.743

Bill History

Mar 21, 2005

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Ways and Means. To printer.

Mar 22, 2005

  • From printer. To committee.

Mar 28, 2005

  • Notice of exemption.

May 17, 2005

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

May 18, 2005

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 743.) To printer.

May 19, 2005

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint.

May 23, 2005

  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 42, Nays: None.) To Senate.

May 25, 2005

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Finance. To committee.

Jun 07, 2005

  • (No further action taken.)

Horizontal Rule Bar
Session Info | NELIS | Interim Info | Law Library | General Info | Counsel Bureau | Research Library | Assembly | Senate | FAQs  
View Scheduled Meetings | Publications | Proposals | Career Opportunities | Gift Shop | Site Map | Contact Us  


© 2017 Nevada Legislative Counsel Bureau
Nevada LCB Logo