Nevada Legislature Header Graphic Home -
NELIS -
Search -
View Scheduled Meetings -
Spacer
Battle Born Flag
AB319
Introduced on: Mar 21, 2005
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Weber
Requires employer to post notice of rights and benefits available to persons who perform service in uniformed services. (BDR 53-352)
DECLARED EXEMPT
Fiscal Notes View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: Increases or Newly Provides for Term of Imprisonment in County or City Jail or Detention Facility.
Effect on State: Yes.
Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(No further action taken.)

Upcoming Hearings
    
Past Hearings
  Assembly Government Affairs     Apr-14-2005 07:30 AM    Minutes      Pending.
  Assembly Government Affairs     Apr-15-2005 07:30 AM    Minutes      Amend, and do pass as amended.
    
 
Votes
 
Bill Text As Introduced     1st Reprint                                
Amendments Amend. No.576

Bill History

Mar 21, 2005

  • Read first time.
  • Referred to Committee on Judiciary.
  • Action of referral rescinded.
  • Referred to Concurrent Committees on Government Affairs and Ways and Means. To printer.

Mar 22, 2005

  • From printer. To committees.

Apr 15, 2005

  • Notice of exemption.

Apr 22, 2005

  • From Concurrent Committee on Government Affairs: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 576.) To printer.

Apr 25, 2005

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint.
  • To Concurrent Committee on Ways and Means.

Jun 07, 2005

  • (No further action taken.)

Horizontal Rule Bar
Session Info | NELIS | Interim Info | Law Library | General Info | Counsel Bureau | Research Library | Assembly | Senate | FAQs  
View Scheduled Meetings | Publications | Proposals | Career Opportunities | Gift Shop | Site Map | Contact Us  


© 2017 Nevada Legislative Counsel Bureau
Nevada LCB Logo