Nevada Legislature Header Graphic Home -
NELIS -
Search -
View Scheduled Meetings -
Spacer
Battle Born Flag
AB321
Introduced on: Mar 21, 2005
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Perkins
Provides for Nevada Report to Taxpayers on status of state finances. (BDR 31-1198)
DECLARED EXEMPT
Fiscal Notes View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Yes.
Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(No further action taken.)

Upcoming Hearings
    
Past Hearings
  Assembly Government Affairs     Apr-14-2005 07:30 AM    Minutes      Do pass.
  Assembly Ways and Means     Apr-26-2005 07:30 AM    Minutes      No Action.
  Assembly Ways and Means     May-25-2005 08:00 AM    Minutes      Amend, and do pass as amended.
  Senate Finance     May-31-2005 08:00 AM    Minutes      No Action.
    
 
Votes
  Assembly Final Passage    May-27   Yea 41,   Nay 0,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
 
Bill Text As Introduced     1st Reprint                                
Amendments Amend. No.1016

Bill History

Mar 21, 2005

  • Read first time.
  • Referred to Committee on Ways and Means.
  • Action of referral rescinded.
  • Referred to Concurrent Committees on Government Affairs and Ways and Means. To printer.

Mar 22, 2005

  • From printer. To committees.

Apr 08, 2005

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 14, 2005

  • From Concurrent Committee on Government Affairs: Do pass.
  • To Concurrent Committee on Ways and Means.

Apr 15, 2005

  • Notice of exemption.

May 27, 2005

  • From Concurrent Committee on Ways and Means: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
  • Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 1016.) To printer.
  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint.
  • Placed on General File.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 41, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Senate.

May 30, 2005

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Finance. To committee.

Jun 07, 2005

  • (No further action taken.)

Horizontal Rule Bar
Session Info | NELIS | Interim Info | Law Library | General Info | Counsel Bureau | Research Library | Assembly | Senate | FAQs  
View Scheduled Meetings | Publications | Proposals | Career Opportunities | Gift Shop | Site Map | Contact Us  


© 2017 Nevada Legislative Counsel Bureau
Nevada LCB Logo