Nevada Legislature Header Graphic Home -
NELIS -
Search -
View Scheduled Meetings -
Spacer
Battle Born Flag
AB338
Introduced on: Mar 21, 2005
By: Commerce and Labor
Makes various changes relating to insurance. (BDR 57-232)
DECLARED EXEMPT
Fiscal Notes View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Yes.
Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 456.

Upcoming Hearings
    
Past Hearings
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Mar-21-2005 02:00 PM    Minutes      Discussed as BDR.
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Apr-11-2005 12:00 PM    Minutes      Pending.
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Apr-13-2005 12:00 PM    Minutes      Amend, and do pass as amended.
  Assembly Ways and Means     May-02-2005 Upon Adjournment    Minutes      No Action.
  Senate Commerce and Labor     May-16-2005 09:00 AM    Minutes      Mentioned Not Agendized.
  Assembly Ways and Means     May-18-2005 Upon Adjournment    Minutes      No Action.
  Assembly Ways and Means     May-19-2005 07:30 AM    Minutes      Amend, and do pass as amended.
  Senate Finance     May-20-2005 08:00 AM    Minutes      Mentioned No Jurisdiction.
  Senate Commerce and Labor     May-26-2005 08:00 AM    Minutes      Mentioned No Jurisdiction.
  Senate Commerce and Labor     May-27-2005 08:00 AM    Minutes      Amend, and do pass as amended.
  Senate Commerce and Labor     Jun-02-2005 03:30 PM    Minutes      No Action.
  Senate Commerce and Labor     Jun-03-2005 Upon Adjournment    Minutes      No Action.
    
 
Votes (2/3 Majority Required)
  Assembly Final Passage    May-25   Yea 42,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
  Senate Final Passage    Jun-03   Yea 14,   Nay 6,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 1,   Absent 0
 
Bill Text As Introduced     1st Reprint         2nd Reprint     3rd Reprint     4th Reprint     5th Reprint     As Enrolled        
Amendments Amend. No.323 Amend. No.874 Amend. No.1120 Amend. No.1135 Amend. No.1147

Bill History

Mar 21, 2005

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To printer.

Mar 22, 2005

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 14, 2005

  • Notice of exemption.

Apr 25, 2005

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 323.) To printer.

Apr 26, 2005

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint.
  • Taken from General File.
  • Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. To committee.

May 23, 2005

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

May 24, 2005

  • Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 874.) To printer.

May 25, 2005

  • From printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Second reprint.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 42, Nays: None.) To Senate.

May 26, 2005

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To committee.

Jun 01, 2005

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 1120.) To printer.

Jun 02, 2005

  • From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Third reprint.
  • Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 1135.) To printer.

Jun 03, 2005

  • From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Fourth reprint.
  • Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 1147.) To printer.
  • From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Fifth reprint.
  • Placed on General File.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 14, Nays: 6, Not voting: 1.) To Assembly.

Jun 04, 2005

  • In Assembly.

Jun 06, 2005

  • Senate Amendment Nos. 1120, 1135 and 1147 concurred in.
  • To enrollment.

Jun 13, 2005

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 17, 2005

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 456.
  • Sections 62, 63, 65, 76.5 to 83, inclusive, 88, 89, 90, 124 to 159, inclusive, 161 and 165 of this act effective June 17, 2005. Sections 64, 66 to 71.1, inclusive, 71.5, 71.7, 72, 73, 74, 75.3, 75.5, 76, 84 to 87.5, inclusive, 88.5, 89.5, 90.3, 90.7, 123.5, 159.3, 159.7, 160, 160.5, 161.5, 162 and 164 of this act effective October 1, 2005. Sections 1 to 61, inclusive, and 91 to 123, inclusive, of this act become effective: (a) June 17, 2005, for the purpose of adopting regulations and performing any other preparatory administrative tasks that are required to carry out the provisions of this act; and (b) On October 1, 2005, for all other purposes. Sections 71.1, 71.7, 74, 75.5 and 162 of this act expire by limitation on the date on which the provisions of 42 U.S.C. § 666 requiring each state to establish procedures under which the state has authority to withhold or suspend, or to restrict the use of professional, occupational and recreational licenses of persons who: (a) Have failed to comply with a subpoena or warrant relating to a proceeding to determine the paternity of a child or to establish or enforce an obligation for the support of a child; or (b) Are in arrears in the payment for the support of one or more children, are repealed by the Congress of the United States. Sections 71.3, 71.9, 75, 75.7 and 163 of this act effective on the date on which the provision of 42 U.S.C. § 666 requiring each state to establish procedures under which the state has authority to withhold or suspend, or to restrict the use of professional, occupational and recreational licenses of persons who: (a) Have failed to comply with a subpoena or warrant relating to a proceeding to determine the paternity of a child or to establish or enforce an obligation for the support of a child; or (b) Are in arrears in the payment for the support of one or more children, are repealed by the Congress of the United States.

Horizontal Rule Bar
Session Info | NELIS | Interim Info | Law Library | General Info | Counsel Bureau | Research Library | Assembly | Senate | FAQs  
View Scheduled Meetings | Publications | Proposals | Career Opportunities | Gift Shop | Site Map | Contact Us  


© 2017 Nevada Legislative Counsel Bureau
Nevada LCB Logo