Nevada Legislature Header Graphic Home -
NELIS -
Search -
View Scheduled Meetings -
Spacer
Battle Born Flag
SB252
Introduced on: Mar 22, 2005
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Cegavske
Makes various changes relating to elections in certain larger counties. (BDR 24971)
Fiscal Notes View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: May have Fiscal Impact.
Effect on State: No.
Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.4, no further action allowed.)

Upcoming Hearings
    
Past Hearings
  Senate Legislative Operations and Elections     Mar-29-2005 02:00 PM    Minutes      No Action.
  Senate Legislative Operations and Elections     Apr-07-2005 02:00 PM    Minutes      Amend, and do pass as amended.
  Assembly Elections, Procedures, Ethics, and Constitutional Amendments     May-05-2005 03:45 PM    Minutes      Pending.
  Assembly Elections, Procedures, Ethics, and Constitutional Amendments     May-19-2005 03:45 PM    Minutes      Amend, and do pass as amended.
    
 
Votes
  Senate Final Passage    Apr-26   Yea 19,   Nay 1,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
  Assembly Final Passage    May-27   Yea 31,   Nay 10,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
 
Bill Text As Introduced     1st Reprint         2nd Reprint                        
Amendments Amend. No.591 Amend. No.900

Bill History

Mar 22, 2005

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To printer.

Mar 23, 2005

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 25, 2005

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 591.) To printer.

Apr 26, 2005

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 19, Nays: 1, Excused: 1.) To Assembly.

Apr 27, 2005

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Elections, Procedures, Ethics, and Constitutional Amendments. To committee.

May 23, 2005

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

May 24, 2005

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 900.) To printer.

May 25, 2005

  • From printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Second reprint.
  • Taken from General File.
  • Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 26, 2005

  • Taken from General File.
  • Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 27, 2005

  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 31, Nays: 10, Excused: 1.)
  • Action of passage rescinded.
  • Taken from General File.
  • Placed on Chief Clerk's desk.

May 28, 2005

  • (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.4, no further action allowed.)

Horizontal Rule Bar
Session Info | NELIS | Interim Info | Law Library | General Info | Counsel Bureau | Research Library | Assembly | Senate | FAQs  
View Scheduled Meetings | Publications | Proposals | Career Opportunities | Gift Shop | Site Map | Contact Us  


© 2017 Nevada Legislative Counsel Bureau
Nevada LCB Logo