Nevada Legislature Header Graphic Home -
NELIS -
Search -
View Scheduled Meetings -
Spacer
Battle Born Flag
AB347
Introduced on: Mar 22, 2005
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Goicoechea , Grady , Carpenter , McGinness , Amodei , Beers
Revises provisions governing exemptions from sales and use taxes on farm machinery and equipment. (BDR 32-981)
DECLARED EXEMPT
Fiscal Notes View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: May have Fiscal Impact.
Effect on State: No.
Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(No further action taken.)

Upcoming Hearings
    
Past Hearings
  Assembly Government Affairs     Apr-07-2005 07:30 AM    Minutes      Pending.
  Assembly Government Affairs     Apr-11-2005 07:30 AM    Minutes      Do pass.
  Assembly Government Affairs     Apr-15-2005 07:30 AM    Minutes      .
  Assembly Ways and Means     Apr-25-2005 08:30 AM    Minutes      No Action.
  Assembly Ways and Means     Jun-03-2005 08:00 AM    Minutes      Do pass.
    
 
Votes
  Assembly Final Passage    Jun-03   Yea 41,   Nay 1,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
 
Bill Text As Introduced                                    
Amendments

Bill History

Mar 22, 2005

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer.

Mar 23, 2005

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 12, 2005

  • From committee: Do pass.

Apr 14, 2005

  • Read second time.

Apr 15, 2005

  • Taken from General File.
  • Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 18, 2005

  • Taken from General File.
  • Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means.

Apr 19, 2005

  • Notice of exemption.
  • To committee.

Jun 03, 2005

  • From committee: Do pass.
  • Placed on General File.
  • Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 41, Nays: 1.) To Senate.

Jun 04, 2005

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Taxation. To committee.

Jun 07, 2005

  • (No further action taken.)

Horizontal Rule Bar
Session Info | NELIS | Interim Info | Law Library | General Info | Counsel Bureau | Research Library | Assembly | Senate | FAQs  
View Scheduled Meetings | Publications | Proposals | Career Opportunities | Gift Shop | Site Map | Contact Us  


© 2017 Nevada Legislative Counsel Bureau
Nevada LCB Logo