Nevada Legislature Header Graphic Home -
NELIS -
Search -
View Scheduled Meetings -
Spacer
Battle Born Flag
SB260
Introduced on: Mar 22, 2005
By: Human Resources and Education
Revises provisions concerning provision of prescription drugs pursuant to Medicaid program. (BDR 38-794)
Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.
Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.3, no further action allowed.)

Upcoming Hearings
    
Past Hearings
  Senate Human Resources and Education     Apr-08-2005 Upon Adjournment    Minutes      Amend, and do pass as amended.
    
 
Votes
  Senate Final Passage    Apr-15   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
 
Bill Text As Introduced     1st Reprint                                
Amendments Amend. No.232

Bill History

Mar 22, 2005

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Human Resources and Education. To printer.

Mar 23, 2005

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 13, 2005

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

Apr 14, 2005

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 232.) To printer.

Apr 15, 2005

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.

Apr 18, 2005

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To committee.

May 21, 2005

  • (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.3, no further action allowed.)

Horizontal Rule Bar
Session Info | Current NELIS | Previous NELIS | Interim Info | Law Library | General Info | Counsel Bureau | Research Library | Assembly | Senate | FAQs  
View Scheduled Meetings | Publications | Proposals | Career Opportunities | Gift Shop | Site Map | Contact Us  


© 2014 Nevada Legislative Counsel Bureau
Nevada LCB Logo