Nevada Legislature Header Graphic Home -
NELIS -
Search -
View Scheduled Meetings -
Spacer
Battle Born Flag
SB267
Introduced on: Mar 22, 2005
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Care , Hardy
Makes various changes regarding Open Meeting Law. (BDR 19-77)
Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.
Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 466.

Upcoming Hearings
    
Past Hearings
  Senate Government Affairs     Apr-04-2005 02:00 PM    Minutes      No Action.
  Senate Government Affairs     Apr-13-2005 02:00 PM    Minutes      Amend, and do pass as amended.
  Assembly Government Affairs     May-03-2005 08:00 AM    Minutes      Discussion only.
  Assembly Government Affairs     May-04-2005 08:00 AM    Minutes      Pending.
  Assembly Government Affairs     May-18-2005 08:00 AM    Minutes      Amend, and do pass as amended.
  Senate Government Affairs     May-30-2005 02:00 PM    Minutes      Concur.
    
 
Votes
  Senate Final Passage    Apr-26   Yea 19,   Nay 1,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
  Assembly Final Passage    May-27   Yea 28,   Nay 13,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
 
Bill Text As Introduced     1st Reprint         2nd Reprint                 As Enrolled        
Amendments Amend. No.639 Amend. No.1066

Bill History

Mar 22, 2005

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer.

Mar 23, 2005

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 25, 2005

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Taken from Second Reading File. Placed on Second Reading File for next legislative day.

Apr 26, 2005

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 639.) To printer.
  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint.
  • Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 19, Nays: 1, Excused: 1.) To Assembly.

Apr 27, 2005

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To committee.

May 26, 2005

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Taken from Second Reading File.
  • Placed on Chief Clerk's desk.

May 27, 2005

  • Taken from Chief Clerk's desk.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 1066.) To printer.
  • From printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Second reprint.
  • Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 28, Nays: 13, Excused: 1.) To Senate.

May 30, 2005

  • In Senate.

May 31, 2005

  • Assembly Amendment No. 1066 concurred in. To enrollment.

Jun 02, 2005

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 17, 2005

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 466.
  • Effective October 1, 2005.

Horizontal Rule Bar
Session Info | NELIS | Interim Info | Law Library | General Info | Counsel Bureau | Research Library | Assembly | Senate | FAQs  
View Scheduled Meetings | Publications | Proposals | Career Opportunities | Gift Shop | Site Map | Contact Us  


© 2017 Nevada Legislative Counsel Bureau
Nevada LCB Logo