Nevada Legislature Header Graphic Home -
NELIS -
Search -
View Scheduled Meetings -
Spacer
Battle Born Flag
SB270
Introduced on: Mar 22, 2005
By: Judiciary
Revises provisions governing unclaimed property. (BDR 10-581)
Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.
Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 127.

Upcoming Hearings
    
Past Hearings
  Senate Judiciary     Mar-30-2005 08:00 AM    Minutes      Do pass.
  Assembly Judiciary     Apr-27-2005 08:00 AM    Minutes      Pending.   Do pass, and place on Consent Calendar.
    
 
Votes
  Senate Final Passage    Apr-01   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
  Assembly Consent Calendar    May-13   Yea 40,   Nay 0,   Excused 2,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
 
Bill Text As Introduced                             As Enrolled        
Amendments

Bill History

Mar 22, 2005

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.

Mar 23, 2005

  • From printer. To committee.

Mar 30, 2005

  • From committee: Do pass.

Mar 31, 2005

  • Read second time.

Apr 01, 2005

  • Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.

Apr 04, 2005

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.

May 12, 2005

  • From committee: Do pass, and place on Consent Calendar.

May 13, 2005

  • Read. Passed on Consent Calendar. Title approved. (Yeas: 40, Nays: None, Excused: 2.) To Senate.

May 16, 2005

  • In Senate. To enrollment.

May 18, 2005

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

May 19, 2005

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 127.
  • Effective July 1, 2005.

Horizontal Rule Bar
Session Info | NELIS | Interim Info | Law Library | General Info | Counsel Bureau | Research Library | Assembly | Senate | FAQs  
View Scheduled Meetings | Publications | Proposals | Career Opportunities | Gift Shop | Site Map | Contact Us  


© 2017 Nevada Legislative Counsel Bureau
Nevada LCB Logo