Nevada Legislature Header Graphic Home -
NELIS -
Search -
View Scheduled Meetings -
Spacer
Battle Born Flag
AJR8
Introduced on: Mar 23, 2005
By: Elections, Procedures, Ethics, and Constitutional Amendments
Proposes to amend Nevada Constitution to specify time of determination of number of signatures required on petition for initiative or referendum. (BDR C-1069)
Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.
Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
File No. 86.

Upcoming Hearings
    
Past Hearings
  Assembly Elections, Procedures, Ethics, and Constitutional Amendments     Mar-22-2005 05:40 PM    Minutes      Discussed as BDR.
  Assembly Elections, Procedures, Ethics, and Constitutional Amendments     Apr-07-2005 Upon Adjournment    Minutes      Do pass.
  Senate Legislative Operations and Elections     May-10-2005 02:00 PM    Minutes      No Action.
  Senate Legislative Operations and Elections     May-12-2005 02:00 PM    Minutes      Do pass.
    
 
Votes
  Assembly Final Passage    Apr-25   Yea 42,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
  Senate Final Passage    May-23   Yea 20,   Nay 0,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
 
Bill Text As Introduced     1st Reprint                         As Enrolled        
Amendments Amend. No.569

Bill History

Mar 23, 2005

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Elections, Procedures, Ethics, and Constitutional Amendments. To printer.

Mar 24, 2005

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 12, 2005

  • From committee: Do pass.

Apr 14, 2005

  • Read second time.

Apr 15, 2005

  • Taken from General File.
  • Placed on Chief Clerk's desk.

Apr 22, 2005

  • Taken from Chief Clerk's desk.
  • Placed on General File.
  • Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 569.) To printer.

Apr 25, 2005

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 42, Nays: None.) To Senate.

Apr 26, 2005

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To committee.

May 13, 2005

  • From committee: Do pass.

May 16, 2005

  • Read second time.

May 17, 2005

  • Taken from General File. Placed on Secretary's desk.

May 23, 2005

  • Taken from Secretary's desk. Placed on General File.
  • Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 20, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Assembly.

May 24, 2005

  • In Assembly. To enrollment.

May 25, 2005

  • Enrolled and delivered to Secretary of State.
  • File No. 86.
  • Return to 2007 Session.

Horizontal Rule Bar
Session Info | NELIS | Interim Info | Law Library | General Info | Counsel Bureau | Research Library | Assembly | Senate | FAQs  
View Scheduled Meetings | Publications | Proposals | Career Opportunities | Gift Shop | Site Map | Contact Us  


© 2017 Nevada Legislative Counsel Bureau
Nevada LCB Logo