Nevada Legislature Header Graphic Home -
NELIS -
Search -
View Scheduled Meetings -
Spacer
Battle Born Flag
SB276
Introduced on: Mar 23, 2005
By: Commerce and Labor
Establishes uniform disciplinary process for certain regulatory bodies which administer occupational licensing. (BDR 54-98)
Fiscal Notes View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Yes.
Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 225.

Upcoming Hearings
    
Past Hearings
  Senate Commerce and Labor     Mar-30-2005 07:30 AM    Minutes      Subcommittee.
  Senate Commerce and Labor     Mar-31-2005 07:30 AM    Minutes      No Action.
  Senate Commerce and Labor     Apr-12-2005 08:00 AM    Minutes      No Action.
  Senate Commerce and Labor     Apr-14-2005 08:00 AM    Minutes      Amend, and do pass as amended.
  Assembly Government Affairs     May-09-2005 09:00 AM    Minutes      Mentioned no jurisdiction.
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     May-09-2005 02:00 PM    Minutes      Amend, and do pass as amended.
  Senate Commerce and Labor     May-27-2005 08:00 AM    Minutes      Concur.
    
 
Votes
  Senate Final Passage    Apr-26   Yea 20,   Nay 0,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
  Assembly Final Passage    May-25   Yea 42,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
 
Bill Text As Introduced     1st Reprint         2nd Reprint                 As Enrolled        
Amendments Amend. No.434 Amend. No.721

Bill History

Mar 23, 2005

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To printer.

Mar 24, 2005

  • From printer. To committee.

Mar 28, 2005

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 25, 2005

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 434.) To printer.

Apr 26, 2005

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 20, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Assembly.

Apr 27, 2005

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To committee.

May 18, 2005

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

May 23, 2005

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 721.) To printer.

May 24, 2005

  • From printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Second reprint.
  • Taken from General File.
  • Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 25, 2005

  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 42, Nays: None.) To Senate.

May 26, 2005

  • In Senate.

May 27, 2005

  • Assembly Amendment No. 721 concurred in. To enrollment.

May 30, 2005

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 02, 2005

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 225.
  • Sections 1 to 203, inclusive, 205 to 234, inclusive, 236 to 242, inclusive,and 243 effective October 1, 2005. Sections 203 and 234 expire by limitation on the date on which the provisions of 42 U.S.C. § 666 requiring each state to establish procedures under which the state has authority to withhold or suspend, or to restrict the use of professional, occupational and recreational licenses of persons who: (a) Have failed to comply with a subpoena or warrant relating to a proceeding to determine the paternity of a child or to establish or enforce an obligation for the support of a child; or (b) are in arrears in the payment for the support of one or more children, are repealed by the Congress of the United States. Sections 204 and 235 effective on the date on which the provisions of 42 U.S.C. § 666 requiring each state to establish procedures under which the state has authority to withhold or suspend, or to restrict the use of professional, occupational and recreational licenses of persons who: (a) Have failed to comply with a subpoena or warrant relating to a proceeding to determine the paternity of a child or to establish or enforce an obligation for the support of a child; or (b) are in arrears in the payment for the support of one or more children, are repealed by the Congress of the United States.

Horizontal Rule Bar
Session Info | NELIS | Interim Info | Law Library | General Info | Counsel Bureau | Research Library | Assembly | Senate | FAQs  
View Scheduled Meetings | Publications | Proposals | Career Opportunities | Gift Shop | Site Map | Contact Us  


© 2017 Nevada Legislative Counsel Bureau
Nevada LCB Logo