Nevada Legislature Header Graphic Home -
NELIS -
Search -
View Scheduled Meetings -
Spacer
Battle Born Flag
SB278
Introduced on: Mar 23, 2005
By: Commerce and Labor
Revises provisions relating to occupational safety and health. (BDR 53-1347)
Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: Increases or Newly Provides for Term of Imprisonment in County or City Jail or Detention Facility.
Effect on State: No.
Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 92.

Upcoming Hearings
    
Past Hearings
  Senate Commerce and Labor     Mar-30-2005 07:30 AM    Minutes      Do pass.
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Apr-27-2005 02:00 PM    Minutes      Pending.
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     May-04-2005 02:00 PM    Minutes      Do pass.
    
 
Votes
  Senate Final Passage    Apr-01   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
  Assembly Final Passage    May-09   Yea 42,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
 
Bill Text As Introduced                             As Enrolled        
Amendments

Bill History

Mar 23, 2005

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To printer.

Mar 24, 2005

  • From printer. To committee.

Mar 30, 2005

  • From committee: Do pass.

Mar 31, 2005

  • Read second time.

Apr 01, 2005

  • Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.

Apr 04, 2005

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To committee.

May 05, 2005

  • From committee: Do pass.

May 06, 2005

  • Read second time.

May 09, 2005

  • Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 42, Nays: None.) To Senate.

May 10, 2005

  • In Senate. To enrollment.

May 11, 2005

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

May 12, 2005

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 92.
  • Effective October 1, 2005.

Horizontal Rule Bar
Session Info | NELIS | Interim Info | Law Library | General Info | Counsel Bureau | Research Library | Assembly | Senate | FAQs  
View Scheduled Meetings | Publications | Proposals | Career Opportunities | Gift Shop | Site Map | Contact Us  


© 2017 Nevada Legislative Counsel Bureau
Nevada LCB Logo