Nevada Legislature Header Graphic Home -
NELIS -
Search -
View Scheduled Meetings -
Spacer
Battle Born Flag
AB380
Introduced on: Mar 23, 2005
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Parks , Giunchigliani
Revises provisions concerning district boards of health in larger counties. (BDR 40-953)
Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.
Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 483.

Upcoming Hearings
    
Past Hearings
  Assembly Health and Human Services     Apr-06-2005 01:30 PM    Minutes      Pending.
  Assembly Health and Human Services     Apr-13-2005 01:30 PM    Minutes      Amend, and do pass as amended.
  Senate Taxation     May-12-2005 11:10 AM    Minutes      Rerefer.
  Senate Human Resources and Education     May-18-2005 01:30 PM    Minutes      No Action.
  Senate Human Resources and Education     May-20-2005 11:00 AM    Minutes      Amend, and do pass as amended.
    
 
Votes
  Assembly Final Passage    Apr-26   Yea 39,   Nay 2,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 1,   Absent 0
  Senate Final Passage    May-27   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
 
Bill Text As Introduced     1st Reprint         2nd Reprint     3rd Reprint     4th Reprint         As Enrolled        
Amendments Amend. No.539 Amend. No.601 Amend. No.895 Amend. No.CA11

Bill History

Mar 23, 2005

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To printer.

Mar 24, 2005

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 25, 2005

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 539.) Placed on Chief Clerk's desk. To printer.
  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. To Chief Clerk's desk.

Apr 26, 2005

  • Taken from Chief Clerk's desk.
  • Placed on General File.
  • Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 601.) To printer.
  • From printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Second reprint.
  • Placed on General File.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 39, Nays: 2, Not voting: 1.) To Senate.

Apr 27, 2005

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Taxation. To committee.

May 12, 2005

  • From committee: Rerefer to Committee on Human Resources and Education.
  • Rereferred to Committee on Human Resources and Education. To committee.

May 25, 2005

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

May 26, 2005

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 895.) To printer.

May 27, 2005

  • From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Third reprint.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.

May 30, 2005

  • In Assembly.

May 31, 2005

  • Senate Amendment No. 895 not concurred in. To Senate.

Jun 01, 2005

  • In Senate.

Jun 02, 2005

  • Senate Amendment No. 895 not receded from. Conference requested. First Conference Committee appointed by Senate. To Assembly.

Jun 03, 2005

  • In Assembly.
  • First Conference Committee appointed by Assembly. To committee.

Jun 05, 2005

  • From committee: Concur in Senate Amendment No. 895 and further amend. First Conference report adopted by Assembly.
  • First Conference report adopted by Senate.
  • To printer.

Jun 06, 2005

  • From printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Fourth reprint.
  • To enrollment.

Jun 13, 2005

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 17, 2005

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 483.
  • Sections 1 to 24, inclusive, and 26 to 33, inclusive, and 34 of this act effective July 1, 2005. Section 24 of this act expires by limitation on the date of the repeal of the federal law requiring each state to establish procedures for withholding, suspending or restricting the use of professional, occupational and recreational licenses for child support arrearages and for noncompliance with certain processes relating to paternity or child support proceedings. Section 25 of this act effective on the date of the repeal of the federal law requiring each state to establish procedures for withholding, suspending or restricting the use of professional, occupational and recreational licenses for child support arrearages and for noncompliance with certain processes relating to paternity or child support proceedings.

Horizontal Rule Bar
Session Info | NELIS | Interim Info | Law Library | General Info | Counsel Bureau | Research Library | Assembly | Senate | FAQs  
View Scheduled Meetings | Publications | Proposals | Career Opportunities | Gift Shop | Site Map | Contact Us  


© 2017 Nevada Legislative Counsel Bureau
Nevada LCB Logo