Nevada Legislature Header Graphic Home -
NELIS -
Search -
View Scheduled Meetings -
Spacer
Battle Born Flag
SB295
Introduced on: Mar 24, 2005
By: Natural Resources
Revises provisions governing motor vehicle fuel and petroleum products. (BDR 51-658)
Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: Increases or Newly Provides for Term of Imprisonment in County or City Jail or Detention Facility.
Effect on State: No.
Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 201.

Upcoming Hearings
    
Past Hearings
  Senate Natural Resources     Apr-04-2005 01:30 PM    Minutes      No Action.
  Senate Natural Resources     Apr-13-2005 01:30 PM    Minutes      Amend, and do pass as amended.
  Assembly Transportation     May-10-2005 01:30 PM    Minutes      Pending.
  Assembly Transportation     May-12-2005 01:30 PM    Minutes      Do pass.
    
 
Votes (2/3 Majority Required)
  Senate Final Passage    Apr-21   Yea 19,   Nay 0,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 1,   Absent 0
  Assembly Final Passage    May-25   Yea 41,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 1,   Absent 0
 
Bill Text As Introduced     1st Reprint                         As Enrolled        
Amendments Amend. No.387

Bill History

Mar 24, 2005

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Natural Resources. To printer.

Mar 25, 2005

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 19, 2005

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

Apr 20, 2005

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 387.) To printer.

Apr 21, 2005

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 19, Nays: None, Excused: 1, Not voting: 1.) To Assembly.

Apr 22, 2005

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Transportation. To committee.

May 13, 2005

  • From committee: Do pass.

May 16, 2005

  • Read second time.

May 17, 2005

  • Taken from General File.
  • Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 18, 2005

  • Taken from General File.
  • Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 23, 2005

  • Taken from General File.
  • Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 24, 2005

  • Taken from General File.
  • Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 25, 2005

  • Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 41, Nays: None, Not voting: 1.) To Senate.

May 26, 2005

  • In Senate. To enrollment.

May 30, 2005

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

May 31, 2005

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 201.
  • Effective October 1, 2005.

Horizontal Rule Bar
Session Info | NELIS | Interim Info | Law Library | General Info | Counsel Bureau | Research Library | Assembly | Senate | FAQs  
View Scheduled Meetings | Publications | Proposals | Career Opportunities | Gift Shop | Site Map | Contact Us  


© 2017 Nevada Legislative Counsel Bureau
Nevada LCB Logo