Nevada Legislature Header Graphic Home -
NELIS -
Search -
View Scheduled Meetings -
Spacer
Battle Born Flag
SB304
Introduced on: Mar 24, 2005
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Beers
Authorizes Attorney General to issue identity theft passports to victims of identity theft. (BDR 15-940)
DECLARED EXEMPT
Fiscal Notes View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Yes.
Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 321.

Upcoming Hearings
    
Past Hearings
  Senate Judiciary     Apr-01-2005 08:00 AM    Minutes      Amend, and do pass as amended.
  Senate Finance     May-02-2005 08:00 AM    Minutes      No Action.
  Senate Finance     May-09-2005 08:00 AM    Minutes      Amend, and do pass as amended.
  Assembly Judiciary     May-25-2005 08:30 AM    Minutes      Do pass.
  Assembly Ways and Means     May-30-2005 09:00 AM    Minutes      No Action.
  Assembly Ways and Means     Jun-04-2005 09:00 AM    Minutes      Do pass.
    
 
Votes
  Senate Final Passage    May-19   Yea 20,   Nay 0,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
  Assembly Final Passage    Jun-04   Yea 40,   Nay 0,   Excused 2,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
 
Bill Text As Introduced     1st Reprint         2nd Reprint                 As Enrolled        
Amendments Amend. No.155 Amend. No.718

Bill History

Mar 24, 2005

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.

Mar 25, 2005

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 04, 2005

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 15, 2005

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

Apr 18, 2005

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 155.)
  • Rereferred to Committee on Finance. To printer.

Apr 19, 2005

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. To committee.
  • Exemption effective.

May 16, 2005

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

May 17, 2005

  • Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 718.) To printer.

May 18, 2005

  • From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint.

May 19, 2005

  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 20, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Assembly.

May 23, 2005

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.

May 25, 2005

  • From committee: Do pass.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time.
  • Taken from General File.
  • Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. To committee.

Jun 04, 2005

  • From committee: Do pass.
  • Placed on General File.
  • Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 40, Nays: None, Excused: 2.) To Senate.

Jun 05, 2005

  • In Senate. To enrollment.

Jun 06, 2005

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 08, 2005

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 321.
  • Section 4 effective June 8, 2005. Sections 1 and 2 effective June 8, 2005 for the purposes of adopting regulations and on January 1, 2006, for all other purposes. Section 3 effective July 1, 2005.

Horizontal Rule Bar
Session Info | NELIS | Interim Info | Law Library | General Info | Counsel Bureau | Research Library | Assembly | Senate | FAQs  
View Scheduled Meetings | Publications | Proposals | Career Opportunities | Gift Shop | Site Map | Contact Us  


© 2017 Nevada Legislative Counsel Bureau
Nevada LCB Logo