Nevada Legislature Header Graphic Home -
NELIS -
Search -
View Scheduled Meetings -
Spacer
Battle Born Flag
SB306
Introduced on: Mar 24, 2005
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Washington
Authorizes pledge of certain sales and use tax proceeds and state funding for certain projects for promotion of economic development and tourism. (BDR 21-1286)
DECLARED EXEMPT
Fiscal Notes View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: May have Fiscal Impact.
Effect on State: Yes.
Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 477.

Upcoming Hearings
    
Past Hearings
  Senate Government Affairs     Apr-08-2005 Upon Adjournment    Minutes      No Action.
  Senate Government Affairs     Apr-11-2005 02:00 PM    Minutes      Amend, and do pass as amended.
  Assembly Government Affairs     May-10-2005 08:00 AM    Minutes      Pending.
  Assembly Government Affairs     May-12-2005 08:00 AM    Minutes      Discussion only.
  Assembly Government Affairs     May-20-2005 08:00 AM    Minutes      Amend, and do pass as amended.
  Assembly Ways and Means     May-30-2005 09:00 AM    Minutes      No Action.
  Assembly Ways and Means     Jun-04-2005 09:00 AM    Minutes      Amend, and do pass as amended.
  Senate Government Affairs     Jun-06-2005 08:45 PM    Minutes      Concur.   Amend, and be adopted as amended.
    
 
Votes
  Senate Final Passage    Apr-22   Yea 19,   Nay 1,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 1,   Absent 0
  Assembly Final Passage    Jun-06   Yea 41,   Nay 1,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
 
Bill Text As Introduced     1st Reprint         2nd Reprint     3rd Reprint     4th Reprint     5th Reprint     As Enrolled        
Amendments Amend. No.262 Amend. No.552 Amend. No.908 Amend. No.1192 Amend. No.1209

Bill History

Mar 24, 2005

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer.

Mar 25, 2005

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 15, 2005

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

Apr 18, 2005

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 262.) To printer.

Apr 19, 2005

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint.
  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 20, 2005

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 21, 2005

  • Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 552.) To printer.

Apr 22, 2005

  • From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. Preamble adopted. (Yeas: 19, Nays: 1, Not voting: 1.) To Assembly.

Apr 25, 2005

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time.
  • Referred to Concurrent Committees on Government Affairs and Ways and Means. To committees.

May 25, 2005

  • From Concurrent Committee on Government Affairs: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 908.) To printer.
  • Notice of exemption.

May 26, 2005

  • From printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Third reprint.
  • To Concurrent Committee on Ways and Means.

Jun 05, 2005

  • From Concurrent Committee on Ways and Means: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on General File.
  • Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 1192.) To printer.
  • From printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Fourth reprint.
  • Placed on General File.
  • Taken from General File.
  • Placed on Chief Clerk's desk.

Jun 06, 2005

  • Taken from Chief Clerk's desk.
  • Placed on General File.
  • Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 1209.) To printer.
  • From printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Fifth reprint.
  • Placed on General File.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. Preamble adopted. (Yeas: 41, Nays: 1.) To Senate.
  • In Senate.
  • Assembly Amendment Nos. 908, 1192 and 1209 concurred in. To enrollment.

Jun 15, 2005

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 17, 2005

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 477.
  • Effective July 1, 2005.

Horizontal Rule Bar
Session Info | NELIS | Interim Info | Law Library | General Info | Counsel Bureau | Research Library | Assembly | Senate | FAQs  
View Scheduled Meetings | Publications | Proposals | Career Opportunities | Gift Shop | Site Map | Contact Us  


© 2017 Nevada Legislative Counsel Bureau
Nevada LCB Logo