Nevada Legislature Header Graphic Home -
NELIS -
Search -
View Scheduled Meetings -
Spacer
Battle Born Flag
AB385
Introduced on: Mar 24, 2005
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Giunchigliani
Makes various changes relating to energy, conservation, construction and renovation and creates incentives and standards for green buildings. (BDR 22730)
DECLARED EXEMPT
Fiscal Notes View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: May have Fiscal Impact.
Effect on State: Yes.
Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(No further action taken.)

Upcoming Hearings
    
Past Hearings
  Assembly Government Affairs     Apr-04-2005 09:00 AM    Minutes      Pending.
  Assembly Government Affairs     Apr-11-2005 07:30 AM    Minutes      .
  Assembly Government Affairs     Apr-15-2005 07:30 AM    Minutes      Amend, and do pass as amended.
  Assembly Ways and Means     May-02-2005 08:30 AM    Minutes      No Action.
  Assembly Ways and Means     May-16-2005 08:30 AM    Minutes      Amend, and do pass as amended.
  Senate Government Affairs     May-27-2005 11:30 PM    Minutes      Rerefer.
  Senate Commerce and Labor     May-31-2005 08:00 AM    Minutes      No Action.
  Senate Commerce and Labor     Jun-01-2005 08:00 AM    Minutes      Amend, and do pass as amended.
  Senate Commerce and Labor     Jun-03-2005 07:23 PM    Minutes      After Passage Discussion.
    
 
Votes (2/3 Majority Required)
  Assembly Final Passage    May-25   Yea 42,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
  Senate Final Passage    Jun-05   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
 
Bill Text As Introduced     1st Reprint         2nd Reprint     3rd Reprint     4th Reprint                
Amendments Amend. No.452 Amend. No.782 Amend. No.1136 Amend. No.1205

Bill History

Mar 24, 2005

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer.

Mar 25, 2005

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 14, 2005

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 25, 2005

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 452.) To printer.

Apr 26, 2005

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint.
  • Read third time.
  • Taken from General File.
  • Notice of exemption.
  • Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. To committee.

May 24, 2005

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on General File.
  • Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 782.) To printer.

May 25, 2005

  • From printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Second reprint.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. Preamble adopted, as amended. (Yeas: 42, Nays: None.) To Senate.

May 26, 2005

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To committee.

May 27, 2005

  • From committee: Rerefer to Committee on Commerce and Labor.
  • Rereferred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To committee.

Jun 04, 2005

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 1136.) To printer.

Jun 05, 2005

  • From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Third reprint.
  • Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 1205.) To printer.
  • From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Fourth reprint.
  • Placed on General File.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.
  • In Assembly.

Jun 07, 2005

  • (No further action taken.)

Horizontal Rule Bar
Session Info | NELIS | Interim Info | Law Library | General Info | Counsel Bureau | Research Library | Assembly | Senate | FAQs  
View Scheduled Meetings | Publications | Proposals | Career Opportunities | Gift Shop | Site Map | Contact Us  


© 2017 Nevada Legislative Counsel Bureau
Nevada LCB Logo