Nevada Legislature Header Graphic Home -
NELIS -
Search -
View Scheduled Meetings -
Spacer
Battle Born Flag
SB313
Introduced on: Mar 24, 2005
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Nolan
Provides immunity from liability to certain persons and governmental entities for certain claims based on consumption of food. (BDR 3-748)
Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.
Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.3, no further action allowed.)

Upcoming Hearings
    
Past Hearings
  Senate Judiciary     Apr-05-2005 08:00 AM    Minutes      No Action.
  Senate Judiciary     Apr-07-2005 08:00 AM    Minutes      No Action.
  Senate Judiciary     Apr-14-2005 08:00 AM    Minutes      Amendment proposed, failed.
  Senate Judiciary     Apr-15-2005 08:00 AM    Minutes      Amend, and do pass as amended.
    
 
Votes
  Senate Final Passage    Apr-22   Yea 15,   Nay 6,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
 
Bill Text As Introduced     1st Reprint                                
Amendments Amend. No.400

Bill History

Mar 24, 2005

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.

Mar 25, 2005

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 20, 2005

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

Apr 21, 2005

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 400.) To printer.

Apr 22, 2005

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 15, Nays: 6.) To Assembly.

Apr 25, 2005

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.

May 21, 2005

  • (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.3, no further action allowed.)

Horizontal Rule Bar
Session Info | NELIS | Interim Info | Law Library | General Info | Counsel Bureau | Research Library | Assembly | Senate | FAQs  
View Scheduled Meetings | Publications | Proposals | Career Opportunities | Gift Shop | Site Map | Contact Us  


© 2017 Nevada Legislative Counsel Bureau
Nevada LCB Logo