Nevada Legislature Header Graphic Home -
NELIS -
Search -
View Scheduled Meetings -
Spacer
Battle Born Flag
AB392
Introduced on: Mar 24, 2005
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Hettrick
Requires adoption of and compliance with uniform regulations governing assessment of property for purposes of taxation. (BDR 32-275)
Fiscal Notes View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Yes.
Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 142.

Upcoming Hearings
    
Past Hearings
  Assembly Growth and Infrastructure     Apr-07-2005 01:30 PM    Minutes      Pending.
  Assembly Growth and Infrastructure     Apr-14-2005 01:30 PM    Minutes      Amend, and do pass as amended.
  Senate Taxation     May-10-2005 02:00 PM    Minutes      Do pass.
    
 
Votes
  Assembly Final Passage    Apr-25   Yea 42,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
  Senate Final Passage    May-16   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
 
Bill Text As Introduced     1st Reprint                         As Enrolled        
Amendments Amend. No.380

Bill History

Mar 24, 2005

  • Read first time.
  • Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor.
  • Action of referral rescinded.
  • Referred to Committee on Growth and Infrastructure. To printer.

Mar 25, 2005

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 12, 2005

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 22, 2005

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 380.) To printer.

Apr 25, 2005

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 42, Nays: None.) To Senate.

Apr 26, 2005

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Taxation. To committee.

May 11, 2005

  • From committee: Do pass.

May 12, 2005

  • Read second time.

May 13, 2005

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 16, 2005

  • Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.

May 17, 2005

  • In Assembly. To enrollment.

May 23, 2005

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

May 24, 2005

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 142.
  • Effective October 1, 2005.

Horizontal Rule Bar
Session Info | NELIS | Interim Info | Law Library | General Info | Counsel Bureau | Research Library | Assembly | Senate | FAQs  
View Scheduled Meetings | Publications | Proposals | Career Opportunities | Gift Shop | Site Map | Contact Us  


© 2017 Nevada Legislative Counsel Bureau
Nevada LCB Logo