Nevada Legislature Header Graphic Home -
NELIS -
Search -
View Scheduled Meetings -
Spacer
Battle Born Flag
AB415
Introduced on: Mar 24, 2005
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
McCleary
Makes various changes relating to requests by Legislators for preparation of legislative measures. (BDR 17772)
DECLARED EXEMPT
Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.
Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 256.

Upcoming Hearings
    
Past Hearings
  Assembly Elections, Procedures, Ethics, and Constitutional Amendments     Apr-19-2005 03:45 PM    Minutes      Amend, and do pass as amended.
  Assembly Elections, Procedures, Ethics, and Constitutional Amendments     Apr-28-2005 03:45 PM    Minutes      Discussion only.
  Senate Legislative Operations and Elections     May-12-2005 02:00 PM    Minutes      No Action.
  Senate Legislative Operations and Elections     May-17-2005 02:00 PM    Minutes      Amend, and do pass as amended.
    
 
Votes
  Assembly Final Passage    May-03   Yea 42,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
  Senate Final Passage    May-27   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
 
Bill Text As Introduced     1st Reprint         2nd Reprint                 As Enrolled        
Amendments Amend. No.675 Amend. No.809

Bill History

Mar 24, 2005

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Elections, Procedures, Ethics, and Constitutional Amendments. To printer.

Mar 25, 2005

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 16, 2005

  • Exempt per Joint Standing Rule 14.6.4(a).

Apr 27, 2005

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

Apr 28, 2005

  • Taken from Second Reading File.
  • Placed on Chief Clerk's desk.
  • Taken from Chief Clerk's desk.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Taken from Second Reading File.
  • Placed on Chief Clerk's desk.

May 02, 2005

  • Taken from Chief Clerk's desk.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 675.) To printer.

May 03, 2005

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 42, Nays: None.) To Senate.

May 04, 2005

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To committee.

May 27, 2005

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 809.)
  • Reprinting dispensed with.
  • Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.)
  • To printer.

May 30, 2005

  • From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint. To Assembly.
  • In Assembly.

Jun 01, 2005

  • Senate Amendment No. 809 concurred in. To enrollment.

Jun 03, 2005

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 06, 2005

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 256.
  • Effective October 1, 2005.

Horizontal Rule Bar
Session Info | NELIS | Interim Info | Law Library | General Info | Counsel Bureau | Research Library | Assembly | Senate | FAQs  
View Scheduled Meetings | Publications | Proposals | Career Opportunities | Gift Shop | Site Map | Contact Us  


© 2017 Nevada Legislative Counsel Bureau
Nevada LCB Logo