Nevada Legislature Header Graphic Home -
NELIS -
Search -
View Scheduled Meetings -
Spacer
Battle Born Flag
AB418
Introduced on: Mar 24, 2005
By: Growth and Infrastructure
Authorizes Board of County Commissioners of Clark County to increase sales tax to employ and equip additional police officers. (BDR S-413)
Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.
Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 249.

Upcoming Hearings
    
Past Hearings
  Assembly Growth and Infrastructure     Mar-24-2005 01:30 PM    Minutes      Discussed as BDR.
  Assembly Growth and Infrastructure     Apr-05-2005 01:30 PM    Minutes      Pending.
  Assembly Government Affairs     Apr-13-2005 07:30 AM    Minutes      Mentioned no jurisdiction.
  Assembly Growth and Infrastructure     Apr-14-2005 01:30 PM    Minutes      Amend, and do pass as amended.
  Senate Taxation     May-03-2005 02:00 PM    Minutes      No Action.
  Senate Taxation     May-05-2005 02:00 PM    Minutes      No Action.
  Senate Taxation     May-10-2005 02:00 PM    Minutes      Amend, and do pass as amended.
    
 
Votes
  Assembly Final Passage    Apr-25   Yea 35,   Nay 7,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
  Senate Final Passage    May-27   Yea 16,   Nay 5,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
 
Bill Text As Introduced     1st Reprint         2nd Reprint     3rd Reprint     4th Reprint         As Enrolled        
Amendments Amend. No.381 Amend. No.726 Amend. No.957 Amend. No.1100

Bill History

Mar 24, 2005

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Growth and Infrastructure. To printer.

Mar 25, 2005

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 22, 2005

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 381.) To printer.

Apr 25, 2005

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 35, Nays: 7.) To Senate.

Apr 26, 2005

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Taxation. To committee.

May 12, 2005

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

May 13, 2005

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 726.) To printer.

May 16, 2005

  • From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint.
  • Read third time.
  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 17, 2005

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 19, 2005

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 23, 2005

  • Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 957.) To printer.

May 24, 2005

  • From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Third reprint.

May 25, 2005

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 26, 2005

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 27, 2005

  • Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 1100.) To printer.
  • From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Fourth reprint.
  • Placed on General File.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 16, Nays: 5.)
  • To Assembly.

May 30, 2005

  • In Assembly.

Jun 02, 2005

  • Senate Amendment Nos. 726, 957 and 1100 concurred in.
  • To enrollment.
  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 03, 2005

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 249.
  • Effective June 3, 2005, for the purposes of enacting ordinances and performing any other preparatory administrative tasks that are necessary to carry out the provisions of this act; and (b) On October 1, 2005, for all other purposes. This act expires by limitation on October 1, 2025.

Horizontal Rule Bar
Session Info | NELIS | Interim Info | Law Library | General Info | Counsel Bureau | Research Library | Assembly | Senate | FAQs  
View Scheduled Meetings | Publications | Proposals | Career Opportunities | Gift Shop | Site Map | Contact Us  


© 2017 Nevada Legislative Counsel Bureau
Nevada LCB Logo