Nevada Legislature Header Graphic Home -
NELIS -
Search -
View Scheduled Meetings -
Spacer
Battle Born Flag
AB425
Introduced on: Mar 24, 2005
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Giunchigliani , Parks , Atkinson , Titus
Revises provisions concerning land use planning. (BDR 221084)
Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.
Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 404.

Upcoming Hearings
    
Past Hearings
  Assembly Government Affairs     Apr-04-2005 09:00 AM    Minutes      Not Heard.
  Assembly Government Affairs     Apr-11-2005 07:30 AM    Minutes      Pending.
  Assembly Government Affairs     Apr-15-2005 07:30 AM    Minutes      Amend, and do pass as amended.
  Senate Government Affairs     May-09-2005 02:00 PM    Minutes      No Action.
  Senate Government Affairs     May-20-2005 11:00 AM    Minutes      Amend, and do pass as amended.
    
 
Votes
  Assembly Final Passage    Apr-26   Yea 36,   Nay 6,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
  Senate Final Passage    May-27   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
 
Bill Text As Introduced     1st Reprint         2nd Reprint     3rd Reprint             As Enrolled        
Amendments Amend. No.621 Amend. No.896 Amend. No.1069

Bill History

Mar 24, 2005

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer.

Mar 25, 2005

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 25, 2005

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 621.) To printer.

Apr 26, 2005

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 36, Nays: 6.) To Senate.

Apr 27, 2005

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To committee.

May 25, 2005

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

May 26, 2005

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 896.) To printer.

May 27, 2005

  • From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint.
  • Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 1069.) To printer.
  • From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Third reprint.
  • Placed on General File.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.

May 30, 2005

  • In Assembly.

Jun 02, 2005

  • Senate Amendment Nos. 896 and 1069 concurred in.
  • To enrollment.

Jun 04, 2005

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 14, 2005

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 404.
  • Effective October 1, 2005.

Horizontal Rule Bar
Session Info | NELIS | Interim Info | Law Library | General Info | Counsel Bureau | Research Library | Assembly | Senate | FAQs  
View Scheduled Meetings | Publications | Proposals | Career Opportunities | Gift Shop | Site Map | Contact Us  


© 2017 Nevada Legislative Counsel Bureau
Nevada LCB Logo