Nevada Legislature Header Graphic Home -
NELIS -
Search -
View Scheduled Meetings -
Spacer
Battle Born Flag
SB347
Introduced on: Mar 25, 2005
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Wiener , Titus , Raggio , Townsend , Anderson
Makes various changes concerning personal identifying information. (BDR 15-15)
Fiscal Notes View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Yes.
Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 485.

Upcoming Hearings
    
Past Hearings
  Senate Commerce and Labor     Apr-05-2005 08:00 AM    Minutes      Mentioned No Jurisdiction.
  Senate Judiciary     Apr-11-2005 08:00 AM    Minutes      No Action.
  Senate Judiciary     Apr-15-2005 08:00 AM    Minutes      Amend, and do pass as amended.
  Assembly Judiciary     May-03-2005 08:00 AM    Minutes      Pending.
  Assembly Judiciary     May-17-2005 08:00 AM    Minutes      Amend, and do pass as amended.
    
 
Votes
  Senate Final Passage    Apr-20   Yea 19,   Nay 0,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 1,   Absent 0
  Assembly Final Passage    May-27   Yea 41,   Nay 0,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
 
Bill Text As Introduced     1st Reprint         2nd Reprint     3rd Reprint             As Enrolled        
Amendments Amend. No.403 Amend. No.796 Amend. No.1031

Bill History

Mar 25, 2005

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.

Mar 28, 2005

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 07, 2005

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 18, 2005

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

Apr 19, 2005

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 403.) To printer.

Apr 20, 2005

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 19, Nays: None, Excused: 1, Not voting: 1.) To Assembly.

Apr 21, 2005

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.

May 23, 2005

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

May 24, 2005

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 796.) To printer.

May 25, 2005

  • From printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Second reprint.
  • Taken from General File.
  • Placed on Chief Clerk's desk.

May 26, 2005

  • Taken from Chief Clerk's desk.
  • Placed on General File.
  • Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 1031.) To printer.

May 27, 2005

  • From printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Third reprint.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 41, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Senate.

May 30, 2005

  • In Senate.

May 31, 2005

  • Assembly Amendment Nos. 796 and 1031 concurred in. To enrollment.

Jun 02, 2005

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 17, 2005

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 485.
  • Sections 1 to 13, inclusive , and section 30 effective October 1, 2005. Sections 14 to 28, inclusive, effective January 1, 2006. Section 29 effective October 1, 2008.

Horizontal Rule Bar
Session Info | Current NELIS | Previous NELIS | Interim Info | Law Library | General Info | Counsel Bureau | Research Library | Assembly | Senate | FAQs  
View Scheduled Meetings | Publications | Proposals | Career Opportunities | Gift Shop | Site Map | Contact Us  


© 2016 Nevada Legislative Counsel Bureau
Nevada LCB Logo