Nevada Legislature Header Graphic Home -
NELIS -
Search -
View Scheduled Meetings -
Spacer
Battle Born Flag
SB356
Introduced on: Mar 25, 2005
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Townsend , Carlton , Hardy , Amodei , Nolan , Rhoads , Tiffany , Wiener
Revises provisions governing amount of sales and use taxes due on certain retail sales. (BDR 321106)
Fiscal Notes View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: May have Fiscal Impact.
Effect on State: Yes.
Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(No further action taken.)

Upcoming Hearings
    
Past Hearings
  Senate Taxation     Apr-07-2005 01:30 PM    Minutes      No Action.
  Senate Taxation     Apr-12-2005 01:30 PM    Minutes      Amend, and do pass as amended.
  Assembly Government Affairs     May-06-2005 08:00 AM    Minutes      No Action.
  Assembly Government Affairs     May-19-2005 08:00 AM    Minutes      Do pass.
  Assembly Government Affairs     May-20-2005 08:00 AM    Minutes      Reconsideration of previous action on: 5-19-05.   Amend, and do pass as amended.
  Senate Taxation     May-31-2005 02:00 PM    Minutes      Do not concur.
    
 
Votes
  Senate Final Passage    Apr-25   Yea 19,   Nay 0,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 1,   Absent 0
  Assembly Final Passage    May-27   Yea 41,   Nay 0,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
 
Bill Text As Introduced     1st Reprint         2nd Reprint                        
Amendments Amend. No.378 Amend. No.906

Bill History

Mar 25, 2005

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Taxation. To printer.

Mar 28, 2005

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 14, 2005

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 21, 2005

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

Apr 22, 2005

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 378.) To printer.

Apr 25, 2005

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 19, Nays: None, Excused: 1, Not voting: 1.) To Assembly.

Apr 26, 2005

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To committee.

May 26, 2005

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 906.) To printer.

May 27, 2005

  • From printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Second reprint.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 41, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Senate.

May 30, 2005

  • In Senate.

Jun 01, 2005

  • Assembly Amendment No. 906 not concurred in. To Assembly.

Jun 02, 2005

  • In Assembly.

Jun 03, 2005

  • Assembly Amendment No. 906 not receded from. Conference requested. First Conference Committee appointed by Assembly. To Senate.

Jun 04, 2005

  • In Senate.
  • First Conference Committee appointed by Senate. To committee.

Jun 07, 2005

  • (No further action taken.)

Horizontal Rule Bar
Session Info | NELIS | Interim Info | Law Library | General Info | Counsel Bureau | Research Library | Assembly | Senate | FAQs  
View Scheduled Meetings | Publications | Proposals | Career Opportunities | Gift Shop | Site Map | Contact Us  


© 2017 Nevada Legislative Counsel Bureau
Nevada LCB Logo