Nevada Legislature Header Graphic Home -
NELIS -
Search -
View Scheduled Meetings -
Spacer
Battle Born Flag
AB430
Introduced on: Mar 25, 2005
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Sibley , Hardy
Proposes to exempt sales of certain auditory devices and appliances, ophthalmic or ocular devices and appliances, durable medical equipment and mobility-enhancing equipment from sales and use taxes and analogous taxes. (BDR 321003)
DECLARED EXEMPT
Fiscal Notes View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: May have Fiscal Impact.
Effect on State: Yes.
Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(No further action taken.)

Upcoming Hearings
    
Past Hearings
  Assembly Government Affairs     Apr-07-2005 07:30 AM    Minutes      Pending.
  Assembly Government Affairs     Apr-15-2005 07:30 AM    Minutes      Amend, and do pass as amended.
    
 
Votes
 
Bill Text As Introduced     1st Reprint                                
Amendments Amend. No.598

Bill History

Mar 25, 2005

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer.

Mar 28, 2005

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 22, 2005

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 598.) Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. To printer.

Apr 25, 2005

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint.
  • To committee.
  • Notice of exemption.

Jun 07, 2005

  • (No further action taken.)

Horizontal Rule Bar
Session Info | NELIS | Interim Info | Law Library | General Info | Counsel Bureau | Research Library | Assembly | Senate | FAQs  
View Scheduled Meetings | Publications | Proposals | Career Opportunities | Gift Shop | Site Map | Contact Us  


© 2017 Nevada Legislative Counsel Bureau
Nevada LCB Logo