Nevada Legislature Header Graphic Home -
NELIS -
Search -
View Scheduled Meetings -
Spacer
Battle Born Flag
AB436
Introduced on: Mar 25, 2005
By: Commerce and Labor
Makes various changes regarding manufacturers of tobacco products. (BDR 32-120)
Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: Increases or Newly Provides for Term of Imprisonment in County or City Jail or Detention Facility.
Effect on State: No.
Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 120.

Upcoming Hearings
    
Past Hearings
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Mar-24-2005 05:55 PM    Minutes      Discussed as BDR.
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Apr-04-2005 01:00 PM    Minutes      Amend, and do pass as amended.
  Senate Taxation     May-03-2005 02:00 PM    Minutes      Do pass.
    
 
Votes (2/3 Majority Required)
  Assembly Final Passage    Apr-18   Yea 38,   Nay 0,   Excused 3,   Not Voting 1,   Absent 0
  Senate Final Passage    May-11   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
 
Bill Text As Introduced     1st Reprint                         As Enrolled        
Amendments Amend. No.186

Bill History

Mar 25, 2005

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To printer.

Mar 28, 2005

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 14, 2005

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

Apr 15, 2005

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 186.) To printer.

Apr 18, 2005

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 38, Nays: None, Excused: 3, Not voting: 1.) To Senate.

Apr 19, 2005

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Taxation. To committee.

May 04, 2005

  • From committee: Do pass.

May 05, 2005

  • Read second time.

May 06, 2005

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 09, 2005

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 10, 2005

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 11, 2005

  • Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.

May 12, 2005

  • In Assembly. To enrollment.

May 16, 2005

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

May 18, 2005

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 120.
  • Sections 1 to 20, inclusive, 22, 23, 24, 27 and 28 of this act effective: (a) May 18, 2005, for the purposes of adopting regulations and taking such other actions as are necessary to carry out the provisions of this act; and (b) On October 1, 2005, for all other purposes. Section 21 of this act effective on January 1, 2006. Section 25 of this act effective on the date a court of competent jurisdiction enters a judgment determining that the amendatory provisions of section 24 of this act are unconstitutional. Section 26 of this act effective on the date a court of competent jurisdiction enters a judgment determining that the amendatory provisions of section 25 of this act are unconstitutional.

Horizontal Rule Bar
Session Info | NELIS | Interim Info | Law Library | General Info | Counsel Bureau | Research Library | Assembly | Senate | FAQs  
View Scheduled Meetings | Publications | Proposals | Career Opportunities | Gift Shop | Site Map | Contact Us  


© 2017 Nevada Legislative Counsel Bureau
Nevada LCB Logo