Nevada Legislature Header Graphic Home -
NELIS -
Search -
View Scheduled Meetings -
Spacer
Battle Born Flag
AB464
Introduced on: Mar 28, 2005
By: Ways and Means
Makes various changes regarding manufacture, sale and use of tobacco products. (BDR 32-1028)
DECLARED EXEMPT
Fiscal Notes View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: May have Fiscal Impact.
Effect on State: Yes.
Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 330.

Upcoming Hearings
    
Past Hearings
  Assembly Ways and Means     Mar-28-2005 09:00 AM    Minutes      Discussed as BDR.
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Apr-08-2005 Upon Adjournment    Minutes      Pending.
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Apr-13-2005 12:00 PM    Minutes      Amend, and do pass as amended.
  Assembly Ways and Means     May-09-2005 08:30 AM    Minutes      No Action.
  Assembly Ways and Means     May-27-2005 08:00 AM    Minutes      Amend, and do pass as amended.
  Senate Taxation     Jun-03-2005 02:00 PM    Minutes      Do pass.
    
 
Votes
  Assembly Final Passage    Jun-02   Yea 41,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 1,   Absent 0
  Senate Final Passage    Jun-03   Yea 20,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 1,   Absent 0
 
Bill Text As Introduced     1st Reprint         2nd Reprint                 As Enrolled        
Amendments Amend. No.326 Amend. No.1130

Bill History

Mar 28, 2005

  • Read first time. Referred to Concurrent Committees on Commerce and Labor and Ways and Means. To printer.

Mar 29, 2005

  • From printer. To committees.

Apr 12, 2005

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 21, 2005

  • Notice of exemption.

Apr 22, 2005

  • From Concurrent Committee on Commerce and Labor: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 326.) To printer.

Apr 25, 2005

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint.
  • To Concurrent Committee on Ways and Means.

Jun 01, 2005

  • From Concurrent Committee on Ways and Means: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on General File.
  • Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 1130.) To printer.

Jun 02, 2005

  • From printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Second reprint.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 41, Nays: None, Not voting: 1.) To Senate.

Jun 03, 2005

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Taxation. To committee.
  • From committee: Do pass.
  • Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
  • Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 20, Nays: None, Not voting: 1.) To Assembly.

Jun 04, 2005

  • In Assembly. To enrollment.

Jun 05, 2005

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 10, 2005

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 330.
  • Sections 1 to 34, inclusive, 36 and 39 to 51, inclusive, and 52 of this act effective June 10, 2005. Sections 35 and 37 of this act effective January 1, 2006. Section 38 of this act effective July 1, 2007.

Horizontal Rule Bar
Session Info | NELIS | Interim Info | Law Library | General Info | Counsel Bureau | Research Library | Assembly | Senate | FAQs  
View Scheduled Meetings | Publications | Proposals | Career Opportunities | Gift Shop | Site Map | Contact Us  


© 2017 Nevada Legislative Counsel Bureau
Nevada LCB Logo