Nevada Legislature Header Graphic Home -
NELIS -
Search -
View Scheduled Meetings -
Spacer
Battle Born Flag
AB484
Introduced on: Mar 28, 2005
By: Government Affairs
Authorizes discussions of workplace relations for certain state employees. (BDR 23-1300)
Fiscal Notes View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Yes.
Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.3, no further action allowed.)

Upcoming Hearings
    
Past Hearings
  Assembly Government Affairs     Mar-28-2005 09:00 AM    Minutes      Discussed as BDR.
  Assembly Government Affairs     Apr-14-2005 07:30 AM    Minutes      Pending.
  Assembly Government Affairs     Apr-15-2005 07:30 AM    Minutes      Amend, and do pass as amended.
  Senate Government Affairs     May-11-2005 02:00 PM    Minutes      No Action.
  Senate Government Affairs     May-20-2005 11:00 AM    Minutes      Do pass, failed.
    
 
Votes
  Assembly Final Passage    Apr-26   Yea 42,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
 
Bill Text As Introduced     1st Reprint                                
Amendments Amend. No.463

Bill History

Mar 28, 2005

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer.

Mar 29, 2005

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 08, 2005

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 25, 2005

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 463.) To printer.

Apr 26, 2005

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 42, Nays: None.) To Senate.

Apr 27, 2005

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To committee.

May 21, 2005

  • (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.3, no further action allowed.)

Horizontal Rule Bar
Session Info | NELIS | Interim Info | Law Library | General Info | Counsel Bureau | Research Library | Assembly | Senate | FAQs  
View Scheduled Meetings | Publications | Proposals | Career Opportunities | Gift Shop | Site Map | Contact Us  


© 2017 Nevada Legislative Counsel Bureau
Nevada LCB Logo