Nevada Legislature Header Graphic Home -
NELIS -
Search -
View Scheduled Meetings -
Spacer
Battle Born Flag
AB489
Introduced on: Mar 28, 2005
By: Growth and Infrastructure , Taxation
Provides for partial abatement of ad valorem taxes imposed on property. (BDR 32-1383)
Fiscal Notes View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: May have Fiscal Impact.
Effect on State: Yes.
Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 20.

Upcoming Hearings
    
Past Hearings
  Assembly Growth and Infrastructure     Mar-25-2005 10:30 AM    Minutes      Discussed as BDR.
  Assembly Growth and Infrastructure     Mar-29-2005 03:30 PM    Minutes      Amend, and do pass as amended.
  Senate Taxation     Mar-30-2005 03:00 PM    Minutes      Amend, and do pass as amended.
  Assembly Government Affairs     Mar-31-2005 08:00 AM    Minutes      Mentioned no jurisdiction.
  Senate Taxation     Mar-31-2005 10:55 AM    Minutes      After Passage Discussion.
  Senate Taxation     Mar-31-2005 01:30 PM    Minutes      After Passage Discussion.
  Senate Finance     Apr-21-2005 08:00 AM    Minutes      After Passage Discussion.
  Senate Taxation     May-03-2005 02:00 PM    Minutes      After Passage Discussion.
  Senate Taxation     May-03-2005 03:30 PM    Minutes      After Passage Discussion.
  Senate Taxation     May-10-2005 02:00 PM    Minutes      After Passage Discussion.
  Senate Finance     May-20-2005 08:00 AM    Minutes      Mentioned No Jurisdiction.
  Assembly Growth and Infrastructure     May-24-2005 01:30 PM    Minutes      Mentioned Not Agendized.
  Senate Finance     Jun-05-2005 08:00 AM    Minutes      Mentioned No Jurisdiction.
    
 
Votes
  Assembly Final Passage    Mar-29   Yea 41,   Nay 1,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
  Senate Final Passage    Mar-31   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
 
Bill Text As Introduced     1st Reprint         2nd Reprint     3rd Reprint     4th Reprint         As Enrolled        
Amendments Amend. No.103 Amend. No.124 Amend. No.129 Amend. No.CA1

Bill History

Mar 28, 2005

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Growth and Infrastructure. To printer.

Mar 29, 2005

  • From printer. To committee.
  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 103.) To printer.
  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint.
  • Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 41, Nays: 1.) To Senate.

Mar 30, 2005

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Taxation. To committee.

Mar 31, 2005

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 124.) To printer.
  • From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint.
  • Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
  • Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 129.) To printer.
  • From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Third reprint.
  • Placed on General File.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.
  • In Assembly.
  • Senate Amendment Nos. 124 and 129 not concurred in. To Senate.
  • In Senate.
  • Senate Amendment Nos. 124 and 129 not receded from. Conference requested. First Conference Committee appointed by Senate. To Assembly.
  • In Assembly.
  • First Conference Committee appointed by Assembly. To committee.

Apr 01, 2005

  • From committee: Concur in Senate Amendment Nos. 124 and 129 and further amend. First Conference report adopted by Assembly.
  • First Conference report adopted by Senate.
  • To printer.
  • From printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Fourth reprint.
  • To enrollment.

Apr 04, 2005

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Apr 06, 2005

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 20.
  • Effective April 6, 2005.

Horizontal Rule Bar
Session Info | Current NELIS | Previous NELIS | Interim Info | Law Library | General Info | Counsel Bureau | Research Library | Assembly | Senate | FAQs  
View Scheduled Meetings | Publications | Proposals | Career Opportunities | Gift Shop | Site Map | Contact Us  


© 2016 Nevada Legislative Counsel Bureau
Nevada LCB Logo