Nevada Legislature Header Graphic Home -
NELIS -
Search -
View Scheduled Meetings -
Spacer
Battle Born Flag
AB492
Introduced on: Mar 28, 2005
By: Commerce and Labor
Revises provisions relating to economic development. (BDR 18-337)
Fiscal Notes View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Yes.
Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.3, no further action allowed.)

Upcoming Hearings
    
Past Hearings
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Mar-28-2005 11:20 AM    Minutes      Discussed as BDR.
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Apr-15-2005 Upon Adjournment    Minutes      Amend, and do pass as amended.
  Senate Government Affairs     May-09-2005 02:00 PM    Minutes      No Action.
    
 
Votes
  Assembly Final Passage    Apr-21   Yea 41,   Nay 0,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
 
Bill Text As Introduced     1st Reprint                                
Amendments Amend. No.534

Bill History

Mar 28, 2005

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To printer.

Mar 29, 2005

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 20, 2005

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 534.) To printer.

Apr 21, 2005

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 41, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Senate.

Apr 22, 2005

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To committee.

May 21, 2005

  • (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.3, no further action allowed.)

Horizontal Rule Bar
Session Info | NELIS | Interim Info | Law Library | General Info | Counsel Bureau | Research Library | Assembly | Senate | FAQs  
View Scheduled Meetings | Publications | Proposals | Career Opportunities | Gift Shop | Site Map | Contact Us  


© 2017 Nevada Legislative Counsel Bureau
Nevada LCB Logo