Nevada Legislature Header Graphic Home -
NELIS -
Search -
View Scheduled Meetings -
Spacer
Battle Born Flag
AB493
Introduced on: Mar 28, 2005
By: Commerce and Labor
Requires Department of Human Resources to apply for Medicaid waiver pursuant to Health Insurance Flexibility and Accountability demonstration initiative. (BDR 38-736)
DECLARED EXEMPT
Fiscal Notes View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Yes.
Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 412.

Upcoming Hearings
    
Past Hearings
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Mar-28-2005 11:20 AM    Minutes      Discussed as BDR.
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Mar-30-2005 01:00 PM    Minutes      Amend, and do pass as amended.
  Assembly Ways and Means     Apr-25-2005 08:30 AM    Minutes      No Action.
  Assembly Ways and Means     May-09-2005 08:30 AM    Minutes      Do pass, as amended.
  Senate Finance     May-13-2005 08:00 AM    Minutes      Mentioned No Jurisdiction.
  Senate Finance     May-13-2005 08:00 AM    Minutes      Mentioned No Jurisdiction.
  Senate Human Resources and Education     May-18-2005 01:30 PM    Minutes      No Action.
  Senate Human Resources and Education     May-20-2005 11:00 AM    Minutes      Amend, and do pass as amended.
    
 
Votes
  Assembly Final Passage    May-10   Yea 41,   Nay 0,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
  Senate Final Passage    May-27   Yea 17,   Nay 4,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
 
Bill Text As Introduced     1st Reprint         2nd Reprint                 As Enrolled        
Amendments Amend. No.159 Amend. No.893

Bill History

Mar 28, 2005

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To printer.

Mar 29, 2005

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 12, 2005

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

Apr 14, 2005

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 159.) Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. To printer.

Apr 15, 2005

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint.
  • To committee.
  • Notice of exemption.

May 09, 2005

  • From committee: Do pass, as amended.

May 10, 2005

  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 41, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Senate.

May 11, 2005

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Human Resources and Education. To committee.

May 25, 2005

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

May 26, 2005

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 893.) To printer.

May 27, 2005

  • From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 17, Nays: 4.) To Assembly.

May 30, 2005

  • In Assembly.

Jun 01, 2005

  • Senate Amendment No. 893 concurred in. To enrollment.

Jun 03, 2005

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 14, 2005

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 412.
  • Sections 1 to 6, inclusive, 16 and 17 of this act effective July 1, 2005. Sections 7 to 15, inclusive, of this act effective on July 1, 2005, and expire by limitation on July 1, 2007, if the waiver applied for by the Director of the Department of Human Resources pursuant to section 2 of this act is not approved by the Federal Government.

Horizontal Rule Bar
Session Info | NELIS | Interim Info | Law Library | General Info | Counsel Bureau | Research Library | Assembly | Senate | FAQs  
View Scheduled Meetings | Publications | Proposals | Career Opportunities | Gift Shop | Site Map | Contact Us  


© 2017 Nevada Legislative Counsel Bureau
Nevada LCB Logo