Nevada Legislature Header Graphic Home -
NELIS -
Search -
View Scheduled Meetings -
Spacer
Battle Born Flag
AB502
Introduced on: Mar 28, 2005
By: Commerce and Labor
Makes various changes to provisions governing unemployment compensation. (BDR 53-323)
Fiscal Notes View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Yes.
Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 129.

Upcoming Hearings
    
Past Hearings
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Mar-28-2005 11:55 AM    Minutes      Discussed as BDR.
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Apr-06-2005 01:00 PM    Minutes      Amend, and do pass as amended.
  Senate Commerce and Labor     Apr-27-2005 09:00 AM    Minutes      Amend, and do pass as amended.
    
 
Votes (2/3 Majority Required)
  Assembly Final Passage    Apr-21   Yea 41,   Nay 0,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
  Senate Final Passage    May-03   Yea 20,   Nay 0,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
 
Bill Text As Introduced     1st Reprint         2nd Reprint                 As Enrolled        
Amendments Amend. No.193 Amend. No.659

Bill History

Mar 28, 2005

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To printer.

Mar 29, 2005

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 20, 2005

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 193.) To printer.

Apr 21, 2005

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 41, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Senate.

Apr 22, 2005

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To committee.

Apr 29, 2005

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

May 02, 2005

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 659.) To printer.

May 03, 2005

  • From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 20, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Assembly.

May 04, 2005

  • In Assembly.

May 16, 2005

  • Senate Amendment No. 659 concurred in. To enrollment.

May 18, 2005

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

May 19, 2005

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 129.
  • Sections 3, 4, 7 to 13, inclusive, 17, 19, and 20 of this act become effective May 19, 2005. Sections 5, 6 and 16 of this act effective on July 1, 2005. Sections 1, 2, 14, 15 and 18 of this act effective January 1, 2006.

Horizontal Rule Bar
Session Info | NELIS | Interim Info | Law Library | General Info | Counsel Bureau | Research Library | Assembly | Senate | FAQs  
View Scheduled Meetings | Publications | Proposals | Career Opportunities | Gift Shop | Site Map | Contact Us  


© 2017 Nevada Legislative Counsel Bureau
Nevada LCB Logo