Nevada Legislature Header Graphic Home -
NELIS -
Search -
View Scheduled Meetings -
Spacer
Battle Born Flag
AB505
Introduced on: Mar 28, 2005
By: Transportation
Makes various changes concerning transportation. (BDR 43973)
Fiscal Notes View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: May have Fiscal Impact.
Effect on State: Yes.
Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Vetoed by the Governor.

Upcoming Hearings
    
Past Hearings
  Assembly Transportation     Mar-28-2005 11:40 AM    Minutes      Discussed as BDR.
  Assembly Transportation     Apr-07-2005 01:30 PM    Minutes      Do pass.
  Senate Transportation and Homeland Security     May-17-2005 02:00 PM    Minutes      Without recommendation and rerefer.
  Senate Transportation and Homeland Security     May-19-2005 02:00 PM    Minutes      Rescind previous action on: 5-17-05.
  Senate Transportation and Homeland Security     May-24-2005 02:00 PM    Minutes      No Action.
  Assembly Transportation     May-24-2005 02:00 PM    Minutes      No Action.
  Senate Transportation and Homeland Security     May-25-2005 12:15 PM    Minutes      Amend, and do pass as amended.
  Senate Transportation and Homeland Security     Jun-04-2005 10:35 AM    Minutes      Do not recede.
    
 
Votes (2/3 Majority Required)
  Assembly Final Passage    Apr-20   Yea 42,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
  Senate Final Passage    Jun-02   Yea 14,   Nay 7,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
 
Bill Text As Introduced     1st Reprint         2nd Reprint     3rd Reprint             As Enrolled        
Amendments Amend. No.320 Amend. No.1012 Amend. No.CA30

Bill History

Mar 28, 2005

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Transportation. To printer.

Mar 29, 2005

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 08, 2005

  • From committee: Do pass.

Apr 12, 2005

  • Read second time.

Apr 14, 2005

  • Taken from General File.
  • Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 15, 2005

  • Taken from General File.
  • Placed on Chief Clerk's desk.

Apr 19, 2005

  • Taken from Chief Clerk's desk.
  • Placed on General File.
  • Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 320.) To printer.

Apr 20, 2005

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 42, Nays: None.) To Senate.

Apr 21, 2005

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Transportation and Homeland Security. To committee.

May 23, 2005

  • Waiver granted effective: May 20, 2005.

Jun 01, 2005

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 1012.) To printer.

Jun 02, 2005

  • From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 14, Nays: 7.)
  • Notice of reconsideration on next legislative day.

Jun 03, 2005

  • To Assembly.
  • In Assembly.
  • Senate Amendment No. 1012 not concurred in. To Senate.

Jun 04, 2005

  • In Senate.
  • Senate Amendment No. 1012 not receded from. Conference requested. First Conference Committee appointed by Senate. To Assembly.
  • In Assembly.
  • First Conference Committee appointed by Assembly. To committee.

Jun 05, 2005

  • From committee: Concur in Senate Amendment No. 1012 and further amend. First Conference report adopted by Assembly.
  • First Conference report adopted by Senate.
  • To printer.

Jun 06, 2005

  • From printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Third reprint.
  • To enrollment.

Jun 13, 2005

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 14, 2005

  • Vetoed by the Governor.

Horizontal Rule Bar
Session Info | NELIS | Interim Info | Law Library | General Info | Counsel Bureau | Research Library | Assembly | Senate | FAQs  
View Scheduled Meetings | Publications | Proposals | Career Opportunities | Gift Shop | Site Map | Contact Us  


© 2017 Nevada Legislative Counsel Bureau
Nevada LCB Logo