Nevada Legislature Header Graphic Home -
NELIS -
Search -
View Scheduled Meetings -
Spacer
Battle Born Flag
SB386
Introduced on: Mar 29, 2005
By: Legislative Operations and Elections
Makes various changes relating to public office. (BDR 24311)
Fiscal Notes View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: Increases or Newly Provides for Term of Imprisonment in County or City Jail or Detention Facility.
Effect on State: Yes.
Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(No further action taken.)

Upcoming Hearings
    
Past Hearings
  Senate Legislative Operations and Elections     Apr-12-2005 02:00 PM    Minutes      No Action.
  Senate Legislative Operations and Elections     Apr-14-2005 02:00 PM    Minutes      Amend, and do pass as amended.
  Assembly Elections, Procedures, Ethics, and Constitutional Amendments     May-05-2005 03:45 PM    Minutes      Pending.
  Assembly Elections, Procedures, Ethics, and Constitutional Amendments     May-19-2005 03:45 PM    Minutes      Amend, and do pass as amended.
  Senate Legislative Operations and Elections     May-31-2005 02:00 PM    Minutes      Do not concur.
    
 
Votes
  Senate Final Passage    Apr-26   Yea 11,   Nay 9,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
  Assembly Final Passage    May-27   Yea 30,   Nay 11,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
 
Bill Text As Introduced     1st Reprint         2nd Reprint                        
Amendments Amend. No.589 Amend. No.931 Amend. No.1002

Bill History

Mar 29, 2005

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To printer.

Mar 30, 2005

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 25, 2005

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 589.) To printer.

Apr 26, 2005

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 11, Nays: 9, Excused: 1.) To Assembly.

Apr 27, 2005

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Elections, Procedures, Ethics, and Constitutional Amendments. To committee.

May 25, 2005

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Taken from Second Reading File.
  • Placed on Chief Clerk's desk.

May 26, 2005

  • Taken from Chief Clerk's desk.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. Nos. 931 and 1002.) To printer.

May 27, 2005

  • From printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Second reprint.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 30, Nays: 11, Excused: 1.) To Senate.

May 30, 2005

  • In Senate.

Jun 01, 2005

  • Assembly Amendment Nos. 931 and 1002 not concurred in. To Assembly.

Jun 02, 2005

  • In Assembly.
  • Assembly Amendment Nos. 931 and 1002 not receded from. Conference requested. First Conference Committee appointed by Assembly. To Senate.

Jun 03, 2005

  • In Senate.
  • First Conference Committee appointed by Senate. To committee.

Jun 07, 2005

  • (No further action taken.)

Horizontal Rule Bar
Session Info | NELIS | Interim Info | Law Library | General Info | Counsel Bureau | Research Library | Assembly | Senate | FAQs  
View Scheduled Meetings | Publications | Proposals | Career Opportunities | Gift Shop | Site Map | Contact Us  


© 2017 Nevada Legislative Counsel Bureau
Nevada LCB Logo