Nevada Legislature Header Graphic Home -
NELIS -
Search -
View Scheduled Meetings -
Spacer
Battle Born Flag
SB388
Introduced on: Mar 29, 2005
By: Taxation
Revises amount of state licensing fee required from certain businesses engaged in gaming. (BDR 41-821)
DECLARED EXEMPT
Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.
Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(No further action taken.)

Upcoming Hearings
    
Past Hearings
  Senate Taxation     Apr-12-2005 01:30 PM    Minutes      No Action.
  Senate Taxation     Apr-14-2005 01:30 PM    Minutes      Amend, and rerefer.
    
 
Votes
 
Bill Text As Introduced     1st Reprint                                
Amendments Amend. No.440

Bill History

Mar 29, 2005

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Taxation. To printer.

Mar 30, 2005

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 15, 2005

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 21, 2005

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

Apr 22, 2005

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 440.)
  • Rereferred to Committee on Finance. To printer.

Apr 25, 2005

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. To committee.
  • Exemption effective.

Jun 07, 2005

  • (No further action taken.)

Horizontal Rule Bar
Session Info | NELIS | Interim Info | Law Library | General Info | Counsel Bureau | Research Library | Assembly | Senate | FAQs  
View Scheduled Meetings | Publications | Proposals | Career Opportunities | Gift Shop | Site Map | Contact Us  


© 2017 Nevada Legislative Counsel Bureau
Nevada LCB Logo